Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/31/2020 at 07:05:17 (UTC).

Grinblat v. Speedway LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2020 Grinblat filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Speedway LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cheryl L. Pollak and Kiyo A. Matsumoto. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01643

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cheryl L. Pollak

Presiding Judge

Kiyo A. Matsumoto

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Semyon Grinblat

Defendants

Speedway LLC

Hess Retail Stores LLC

John Doe 1-X

Corporations 1-X

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Grinblat

10 East 39Th Street, 12Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Defendant Attorney

John Michael Lyons

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP

Two Commerce Square, 2001 Market Street, Suite 3000

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re #5 Amended Complaint by Speedway LLC. (Lyons, John) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

#13

(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Semyon Grinblat. Speedway LLC served on 5/4/2020, answer due 5/28/2020. (Grinblat, Michael) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 7/8/2020 @ 2:15 PM before Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Telephone conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 2:15 PM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 20-1643. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 4/28/2020. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Amended Complaint by Speedway LLC. (Lyons, John) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Speedway LLC identifying Corporate Parent MPC Investment LLC, Corporate Parent Marathon Petroleum Corporation for Speedway LLC. (Lyons, John) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by John Michael Lyons on behalf of Speedway LLC (aty to be noticed) (Lyons, John) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Semyon Grinblat. Speedway LLC served on 4/7/2020, answer due 4/28/2020. (Grinblat, Michael) (Entered: 04/12/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AS TO HESS RETAIL STORES LLC: Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 4/6/2020. (Williams-Jackson, Sandra) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Semyon Grinblat of Hess Retail Stores LLC (Grinblat, Michael) (Entered: 04/05/2020)

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Semyon Grinblat. (Grinblat, Michael) (Entered: 04/05/2020)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Speedway LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

1 #2

Proposed Summons Speedway LLC

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Speedway LLC et al.

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12617336 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Semyon Grinblat. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Speedway LLC et al., #2 Proposed Summons Speedway LLC) (Grinblat, Michael) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER. Plaintiff is ordered to respond to defendant Speedway LLC's #14 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Monday, June 1, 2020 at noon . Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 5/28/2020. (Zhang, Grace) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re #5 Amended Complaint by Speedway LLC. (Lyons, John) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Semyon Grinblat. Speedway LLC served on 5/4/2020, answer due 5/28/2020. (Grinblat, Michael) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 7/8/2020 @ 2:15 PM before Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Telephone conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 2:15 PM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 20-1643. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 4/28/2020. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketELECTRONIC ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Speedway LLC to answer, move, or otherwise respond by 5/28/2020. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 4/28/2020. (Phillips, Lauren) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Amended Complaint by Speedway LLC. (Lyons, John) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Speedway LLC identifying Corporate Parent MPC Investment LLC, Corporate Parent Marathon Petroleum Corporation for Speedway LLC. (Lyons, John) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by John Michael Lyons on behalf of Speedway LLC (aty to be noticed) (Lyons, John) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Semyon Grinblat. Speedway LLC served on 4/7/2020, answer due 4/28/2020. (Grinblat, Michael) (Entered: 04/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AS TO HESS RETAIL STORES LLC: Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 4/6/2020. (Williams-Jackson, Sandra) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Semyon Grinblat of Hess Retail Stores LLC (Grinblat, Michael) (Entered: 04/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Semyon Grinblat. (Grinblat, Michael) (Entered: 04/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Speedway LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12617336 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Semyon Grinblat. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Speedway LLC et al., #2 Proposed Summons Speedway LLC) (Grinblat, Michael) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hess Retail Stores LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SPEEDWAY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Grinblat