This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2020 at 08:19:16 (UTC).

Grimsley v. Cain

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 Grimsley filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Cain. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael J. McShane. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00500

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael J. McShane

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Robert Grimsley

Ontario, OR 97914-8335

Respondent

Brad Cain

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Lynn David Larsen

Attorney at State of Oregon Department of Justice

1162 Court Street, Ne

Salem, OR 97301-4096

Kristen E. Boyd

Attorney at State of Oregon

1162 Court Street, Ne

Salem, OR 97301

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Filed by Robert Grimsley.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

12 #1

Exhibits

#12

(#12) Motion for Reconsideration of Order on Motion to Expedite and Order on motion for preliminary injunction 7 . Filed by Robert Grimsley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Kristen E. Boyd is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Brad Cain.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (Boyd, Kristen) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#9

(#9) Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Brad Cain. Filed by Brad Cain.**1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (Larsen, Lynn) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

8 #2

Petition

8 #1

Acceptance and Acknowledgment

#8

(#8) Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #1 on respondent. Answer is due by 7/13/2020. Signed on 5/12/2020 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment, #2 Petition)**15 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#6

(#6) Supplemental Petition. Filed by Robert Grimsley. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

#5

(#5) Motion to Expedite or Accelerate and Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by Robert Grimsley.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael J. McShane. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

#1

(#1) Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). NO FEE, NO IFP. Filed by Robert Grimsley against Brad Cain.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Clerk's Notice of Emailing to Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091 regarding Magistrate Consent by Party, #11 . **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Filed by Robert Grimsley.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Motion for Reconsideration of Order on Motion to Expedite and Order on motion for preliminary injunction 7 . Filed by Robert Grimsley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. **PRINT NEF ONLY. The Court will e-mail a PDF of the Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge form filed in this case to the prison for delivery to the inmate litigant.**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Kristen E. Boyd is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Brad Cain.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (Boyd, Kristen) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Brad Cain. Filed by Brad Cain.**1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (Larsen, Lynn) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #1 on respondent. Answer is due by 7/13/2020. Signed on 5/12/2020 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment, #2 Petition)**15 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: Denying Motion to Expedite/Accelerate #5 ; Denying Motion for a Preliminary Injunction #5 ). Plaintiff must file a separate civil rights action pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 in order to challenge the conditions of his confinement. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (ps3) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Supplemental Petition. Filed by Robert Grimsley. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion to Expedite or Accelerate and Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by Robert Grimsley.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketFiling fee in amount of $5.00 collected; Receipt No. 88427 issued. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (re) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Clerk's Notice of Emailing to Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091 regarding Magistrate Consent by Party, #3 . **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. **PRINT NEF ONLY. The Court will e-mail a PDF of the Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge form filed in this case to the prison for delivery to the inmate litigant.**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael J. McShane. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). NO FEE, NO IFP. Filed by Robert Grimsley against Brad Cain.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less