This case was last updated from PACER on 07/08/2019 at 07:37:57 (UTC).

Grimm v. Aetna Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/09/2019 Grimm filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Aetna Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Terry R Means. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00388

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry R Means

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stanley Scott Grimm

Defendant

Aetna Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark S Humphreys

Attorney at Mark S Humphreys PC

702 Dalworth Street

Grand Prairie, TX 75050

Defendant Attorneys

Cristin J Mack

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins

7700 Bonhomme Ave, Suite 650

St Louis, MO 63105

Eric P Mathisen

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC

56 S. Washington St., Suite 302

Valparaiso, IN 46383

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER TO SUBMIT JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN... The parties are ordered to electronically file with the clerk of the court the signed joint status report and proposed discovery plan (one instrument) within 28 days of the date of the filing of this order. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 6/13/2019) (wxc) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint,, filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Mack, Cristin) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER DENYING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME #5 ... the Court DENIES the motion as MOOT. Aetna may rely upon the expanded time-frame provided by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(a) in response to the filing of the amended complaint for any extension needed. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 6/4/2019) (wxc) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#7

(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aetna Life Insurance Company filed by Stanley Scott Grimm. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Humphreys, Mark) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER REQUIRING FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT... Plaintiffs amended complaint must be electronically filed with the clerk of the Court no later than June 13, 2019. Failure to timely comply with this order will result in appropriate sanctions, including the dismissal of Plaintiffs claims. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 5/15/2019) (wxc) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

#5

(#5) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company (Mack, Cristin) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric P Mathisen on behalf of Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Mathisen, Eric) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (edm) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Mack, Cristin) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

1 #4

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #3

Cover Sheet

1 #2

1-2 Exhibits 1 - 4

1 #1

1-1 Exhibit A - Index of State Court File

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 352nd District Court of Tarrant County, Texas, case number 352-307354-19 filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9976526) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 1-1 Exhibit A - Index of State Court File, #2 1-2 Exhibits 1 - 4, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Mack, Cristin) Modified on 5/9/2019 (wxc). (Entered: 05/09/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER TO SUBMIT JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN... The parties are ordered to electronically file with the clerk of the court the signed joint status report and proposed discovery plan (one instrument) within 28 days of the date of the filing of this order. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 6/13/2019) (wxc) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint,, filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Mack, Cristin) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER DENYING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME #5 ... the Court DENIES the motion as MOOT. Aetna may rely upon the expanded time-frame provided by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(a) in response to the filing of the amended complaint for any extension needed. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 6/4/2019) (wxc) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aetna Life Insurance Company filed by Stanley Scott Grimm. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Humphreys, Mark) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER REQUIRING FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT... Plaintiffs amended complaint must be electronically filed with the clerk of the Court no later than June 13, 2019. Failure to timely comply with this order will result in appropriate sanctions, including the dismissal of Plaintiffs claims. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 5/15/2019) (wxc) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company (Mack, Cristin) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric P Mathisen on behalf of Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Mathisen, Eric) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (edm) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Mack, Cristin) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 352nd District Court of Tarrant County, Texas, case number 352-307354-19 filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9976526) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 1-1 Exhibit A - Index of State Court File, #2 1-2 Exhibits 1 - 4, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Mack, Cristin) Modified on 5/9/2019 (wxc). (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less