This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/15/2020 at 09:15:54 (UTC).

Grill House, LLC v. Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 Grill House, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kristen L. Mix and William J. Martinez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02108

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kristen L. Mix

Presiding Judge

William J. Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Grill House, LLC

4400 Louisana Street, Suite 1900

Houston, TX 77002

Defendants

Berksire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company

Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert D. Green

Attorney at Robert D. Green & Associates, PC

440 Louisiana Street, Suite 1900

Houston, TX 77002

Hunter M. Klein

Attorney at Robert Green & Associates, P.C.

440 Louisiana Street, Suite 1900

Houston, TX 77002

William Truman Jones, Jr.

Attorney at Green Klein & Wood

440 Louisiana St., Suite 1900

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan Thomas Koehler

Attorney at Foran Glennon Palandech Ponzi & Rudloff PC-Denver

700 17Th Street, Suite 1350

Denver, CO 80202

Brian Edward Devilling

Attorney at Foran Glennon Palandech Ponzi & Rudloff PC-Chicago

222 North La Salle Street, Suite 1400

Chicago, IL 60601-1059

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William Truman Jones, Jr on behalf of Grill House, LLCAttorney William Truman Jones, Jr added to party Grill House, LLC(pty:pla) (Jones, William) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#18

(#18) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/11/20 re: #17 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company. At least one party in this civil action does notconsent to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be assigned to a District Judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(8) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a). (nmarb, ) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#17

(#17) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Berksire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Devilling, Brian) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert Dale Green on behalf of Grill House, LLCAttorney Robert Dale Green added to party Grill House, LLC(pty:pla) (Green, Robert) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Hunter Milam Klein on behalf of Grill House, LLCAttorney Hunter Milam Klein added to party Grill House, LLC(pty:pla) (Klein, Hunter) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#3

(#3) Original COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Berksire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company, filed by Grill House, LLC.(jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Thomas Koehler on behalf of Berksire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company (Koehler, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Berksire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company from Boulder County District Court, Case Number 2020cv30495. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7392910), filed by Berksire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Koehler, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • Docket(#23) MINUTE ORDER. In accordance with efforts to minimize the spread of COVID-19, all counsel or parties who wish to participate in, or members of the public who wish to listen into, the Scheduling Conference set on September 29, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. shall do so by TELEPHONE by calling the Court at 888-363-4749, Access Code: 2115325#, at the time of the hearing. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/14/2020. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, ) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • Docket(#22) ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2019 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 9 /14/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • Docket(#21) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Magistrate Judge Mix, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/14/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William Truman Jones, Jr on behalf of Grill House, LLCAttorney William Truman Jones, Jr added to party Grill House, LLC(pty:pla) (Jones, William) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #17 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02108-WJM. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, ) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/11/20 re: #17 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company. At least one party in this civil action does notconsent to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be assigned to a District Judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(8) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a). (nmarb, ) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Berksire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Devilling, Brian) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #15 Notice of Entry of Appearance, #14 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorneyRobert D. Green and Hunter M. Klein. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request (Suite 1900, and zip code 77002) through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (nmarb, ) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert Dale Green on behalf of Grill House, LLCAttorney Robert Dale Green added to party Grill House, LLC(pty:pla) (Green, Robert) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Hunter Milam Klein on behalf of Grill House, LLCAttorney Hunter Milam Klein added to party Grill House, LLC(pty:pla) (Klein, Hunter) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, ) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-2108-KLM (angar, ) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brian Edward Devilling on behalf of Berksire Hathaway Homestate Insurance CompanyAttorney Brian Edward Devilling added to party Berksire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Devilling, Brian) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • Docket(#7) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STATE COURT ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. By Andrew Ross MacDonald, Boulder County District Court Judge on 07/13/2020. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Original COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Berksire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company, filed by Grill House, LLC.(jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Thomas Koehler on behalf of Berksire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company (Koehler, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Berksire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company from Boulder County District Court, Case Number 2020cv30495. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7392910), filed by Berksire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Koehler, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY HOMESTATE COMPANIES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hunter M. Klein

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William T Jones, Jr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert D. Green