This case was last updated from PACER on 12/16/2019 at 08:08:14 (UTC).

Griggs v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (PLR3)

Case Summary

On 10/17/2019 Griggs filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Social Security Administration, Commissioner of PLR3. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Pamela L Reeves and Christopher H Steger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00290

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela L Reeves

Referral Judge

Christopher H Steger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeffrey Wayne Griggs

Defendant

Social Security Administration, Commissioner of

Interested Party

SSA Office of General Counsel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jimmy W Bilbo

Attorney at Bilbo Law Office

150 North Ocoee Street, P.O. Box 62

Cleveland, TN 37364

 

Court Documents

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Wayne Griggs. SSA Office of General Counsel served on 10/24/2019; Social Security Administration, Commissioner of served on 10/24/2019. (Bilbo, Jimmy) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Wayne Griggs. All Defendants. (Bilbo, Jimmy) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Wayne Griggs. All Defendants. (Bilbo, Jimmy) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons US Attorney, #2 Summons US Attorney General)(ABF) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (ABF) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) SSA COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4106652.), filed by Jeffrey Wayne Griggs. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bilbo, Jimmy) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.