This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/12/2021 at 11:17:14 (UTC).

GRIFFITH v. MEDIX STAFFING SOLUTIONS

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 GRIFFITH filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against MEDIX STAFFING SOLUTIONS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Cynthia Reed Eddy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01941

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cynthia Reed Eddy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHANNON M. GRIFFITH

Defendant

MEDIX STAFFING SOLUTIONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Samuel J. Cordes

Attorney at Rothman Gordon, P.C.

310 Grant Street, 3Rd Floor, Grant Building

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Defendant Attorney

Mark T. Phillis

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

625 Liberty Avenue, 26Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SHANNON M. GRIFFITH. MEDIX STAFFING SOLUTIONS waiver sent on 12/15/2020, answer due 2/16/2021. (Cordes, Samuel) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark T. Phillis on behalf of MEDIX STAFFING SOLUTIONS. (Phillis, Mark) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER ON RULE 12(b) MOTIONS. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 12/15/2020. (cmc) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to MEDIX STAFFING SOLUTIONS (jjg) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MEDIX STAFFING SOLUTIONS (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6156904), filed by SHANNON M. GRIFFITH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjg) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEDIX STAFFING SOLUTIONS INC. AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samuel J. Cordes