This case was last updated from PACER on 12/12/2019 at 06:00:07 (UTC).

Griffith v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 Griffith filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael J. Newman and Thomas M. Rose. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00390

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael J. Newman

Presiding Judge

Thomas M. Rose

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robin Griffith

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael A Rake

Attorney at Horenstein, Nicholson & Blumenthal - 3

124 East Third Street, 5Th Floor

Dayton, OH 45402

Defendant Attorney

John J. Stark

Attorney at US Attorney Office

303 Marconi Boulevard, Suite 200

Columbus, OH 43215

 

Court Documents

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security served on 12/20/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (Rake, Michael) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER OF CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of a final judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 01/02/2020. (jmb) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) JOINT CONSENT OF THE PARTIES TO PROCEED BEFORE THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE . (Baltz, Shefali) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Shefali Baltz for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Baltz, Shefali) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (pb) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Robin Griffith. (pb) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTATION ORDER GRANTING #1 GOVERNMENT'S Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 12/12/2019. (dm) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Robin Griffith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons Form, #4 Summons Form, #5 Summons Form, #6 Summons Form) (Rake, Michael) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.