This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/04/2021 at 10:46:44 (UTC).

Griffin v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 Griffin filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel P. Jordan, III and F. Keith Ball. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00171

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel P. Jordan, III

Referral Judge

F. Keith Ball

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Frederick Griffin

Defendants

Wal-Mart Stores East, LP

John and Jane Does 1-4

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William G. Shields

Attorney at SHIELDS GOODSON, PLLC

P. O. Box 707, 555 Tombigbee St., Ste. 100 (Jackson - 39201)

Madison, MS 39130

Defendant Attorneys

J. Caroline Johnson

Attorney at WELLS, MARBLE & HURST, PLLC - Ridgeland

P. O. Box 131 (Jackson - 39205-0131), 300 Concourse Blvd., Suite 200

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Thomas M. Louis

Attorney at WELLS, MARBLE & HURST, PLLC - Ridgeland

P. O. Box 131 (Jackson - 39205-0131), 300 Concourse Blvd., Suite 200

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Rajita Iyer Moss

Attorney at WELLS, MARBLE & HURST, PLLC - Ridgeland

P. O. Box 131 (Jackson - 39205-0131), 300 Concourse Blvd., Suite 200

Ridgeland, MS 39157

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#6

(#6) State Court Record by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

5 #1

Exhibit A - Letter to Clerk

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File State Court File from Circuit Court of Hinds County by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter to Clerk)(Johnson, J.) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by J. Caroline Johnson on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Louis on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Louis, Thomas) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - Copies of process, pleadings served on Walmart

1 #2

Exhibit B - PL's Responses to RFA

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP from Hinds County Circuit Court, MS, case number 25CI1:20-cv-759-EFP. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0538-4498733) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - PL's Responses to RFA, #3 Exhibit C - Copies of process, pleadings served on Walmart, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) State Court Record by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File State-Court File from Circuit Court of Hinds County. The deadline to submit the state-court file is extended to 4/2/2021. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 3/22/2021. (dcw) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File State Court File from Circuit Court of Hinds County by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter to Clerk)(Johnson, J.) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by J. Caroline Johnson on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Louis on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Louis, Thomas) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP from Hinds County Circuit Court, MS, case number 25CI1:20-cv-759-EFP. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0538-4498733) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - PL's Responses to RFA, #3 Exhibit C - Copies of process, pleadings served on Walmart, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William G. Shields