This case was last updated from PACER on 03/13/2020 at 07:52:49 (UTC).

Griffin v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 Griffin filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Life Insurance Company of North America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Janet Bond Arterton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00052

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Janet Bond Arterton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sheila Griffin

Defendant

Life Insurance Company of North America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ivan A. Ramos

Attorney at Ramos Law

255 Main St., Suite 401

Hartford, CT 06106

Defendant Attorneys

Gregory J. Bennici

Attorney at Robinson & Cole LLP, Stamford

1055 Washington Boulevard 9Th Floor

Stamford, CT 06901-2249

Patrick Walter Begos

Attorney at Robinson & Cole LLP, Stamford

1055 Washington Boulevard 9Th Floor

Stamford, CT 06901-2249

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 2/18/2020, answer due 4/18/2020 filed by Sheila Griffin. (Ramos, Ivan) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory J. Bennici on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Bennici, Gregory) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Walter Begos on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Begos, Patrick) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Sheila Griffin Signed by Clerk on 1/13/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#4

(#4) Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 1/13/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#3

(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 1/13/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#2

(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/13/2020 Discovery due by 7/14/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 8/18/2020 Signed by Clerk on 1/13/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5634284.), filed by Sheila Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramos, Ivan) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 2/18/2020, answer due 4/18/2020 filed by Sheila Griffin. (Ramos, Ivan) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory J. Bennici on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Bennici, Gregory) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Walter Begos on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Begos, Patrick) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Sheila Griffin Signed by Clerk on 1/13/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 1/13/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 1/13/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/13/2020 Discovery due by 7/14/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 8/18/2020 Signed by Clerk on 1/13/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketJudge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5634284.), filed by Sheila Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramos, Ivan) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less