This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/18/2022 at 02:08:44 (UTC).

Griffin v. Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/07/2022 Griffin filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sarah E. Geraghty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00085

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah E. Geraghty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

W. A. Griffin, MD

Atlanta, GA 30308

Defendants

Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc.

Truist Financial Corporation

Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC

The William Carter Company

Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings

Grady Memorial Hospital Corporation doing business as Grady Health System

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Lindsey B. Mann

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP

600 Peachtree Street Ne, Suite 3000

Atlanta, GA 30308

Margaret Sparks Mathis

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP

600 Peachtree Street Ne, Suite 3000

Atlanta, GA 30308

Keely Collins

Attorney at Elarbee, Thompson, Sapp & Wilson, LLP

800 International Tower, 229 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30303-1614

Patrick Lee Lail

Attorney at Elarbee Thompson Sapp & Wilson

229 Peachtree Street, N.E., 800 International Tower

Atlanta, GA 30303-1614

Alex S. Drummond

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw-Atlanta

Suite 2500, 1075 Peachtree Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

Julie M. Kamps

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP-IL

Suite 800, 233 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606-6448

James Fielding

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

3424 Peachtree Rd., Ne, Ste 1200

Atlanta, GA 30326

Rachel P. Kaercher

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

3424 Peachtree Rd, Ne, Ste 1200

Atlanta, GA 30326

Wesley Earl Stockard

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

3424 Peachtree Road Ne, Suite 1200

Atlanta, GA 30043

Brian David Stoltz

Attorney at Parker Poe Adams & Bernstein LLP

1075 Peachtree Street Ne, Suite 1500

Atlanta, GA 30309

A. Todd Sprinkle

Attorney at Parker Poe Adams & Bernstein LLP

1075 Peachtree Street Ne, Ste 1500

Atlanta, GA 30309

Helen Northcutt Cleveland

Attorney at Cleveland Gilbreath LLC

1266 West Paces Ferry Rd Nw No. 590

Atlanta, GA 30327-3905

 

Court Documents

#58

(#58) RESPONSE re #55 Notice of Filing filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc.. (Mann, Lindsey) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

#57

(#57) RESPONSE re #55 Notice of Filing Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by The William Carter Company. (Stockard, Wesley) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#56

(#56) RESPONSE re #55 Notice of Filing (Defendant's Response To Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority) filed by Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC. (Kamps, Julie) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

55 #1

Exhibit A

55 #55

Main Document

34 #7

Exhibit F - Truist Plan Documents

32 #1

Brief

32 #32

Main Document

31 #31

Main Document

3 #4

Exhibit C - Yardi Evidence of Coverage

3 #3

Exhibit B - Bronze HMO

3 #2

Exhibit A - Southeastern Certificate of Coverage

3 #3

Main Document

#2

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to W. A. Griffin, MD re #2 Order. (abm) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit -B -Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit -A -Fulton State Court Proceedings

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-11502375) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Fulton State Court Proceedings, #2 Exhibit -B -Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/07/2022)

100 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) RESPONSE re #55 Notice of Filing filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc.. (Mann, Lindsey) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) RESPONSE re #55 Notice of Filing Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by The William Carter Company. (Stockard, Wesley) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) RESPONSE re #55 Notice of Filing (Defendant's Response To Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority) filed by Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC. (Kamps, Julie) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) NOTICE Of Filing Supplemental Authority by W. A. Griffin, MD re #29 #31 #32 #33 #34 MOTIONS to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(rsg) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to W. A. Griffin, MD re #54 Order on Motion. (rsg) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) ORDER denying #53 Motion for court to avoid another reassignment of this case. The Court cannot guarantee Dr. Griffin or any litigant that a reassignment will never occur. For example, should the appearance of any new attorney or party present a conflict of interest, then this Court must adhere to Canon 3(C) of the Code of Conduct for United States Judges and recuse herself. The same is true should this Court discover at any point in the litigation that it has personal knowledge of any disputed evidentiary facts in the case. The Court does not anticipate that any such conflict or other issue will arise but, for the reasons stated above, it cannot grant a motion to categorically prohibit any further case reassignment. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 07/19/2022. (rsg) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) MOTION For No Additional Case Reassignment by W. A. Griffin, MD. (rsg) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #48 MOTION for Summary Judgment to District Judge Sarah E. Geraghty. (sap) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) REPLY BRIEF re #48 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Grady Memorial Hospital Corporation. (Cleveland, Helen) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) RESPONSE in Opposition re #48 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by W. A. Griffin, MD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(rsg) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Return of Service Executed by W. A. Griffin, MD. Truist Financial Corporation served on 1/26/2022, answer due 2/16/2022. (vs) Modified on 2/3/2022 (vs). (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Return of Service Executed by W. A. Griffin, MD. Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings served on 1/26/2022, answer due 2/16/2022. (vs) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2022: #1 Corrected PDF) (vs). Modified on 2/3/2022 (vs). (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ENTRY ORDER terminating #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as moot. So ordered by Judge William M. Ray, II on 1/27/22. (jkl) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC, Grady Memorial Hospital Corporation, Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings, The William Carter Company, Truist Financial Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons Crestline, #2 Summons William Carter Co, #3 Summons Truist, #4 Summons Grady)(abm) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC, Grady Memorial Hospital Corporation, Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings, The William Carter Company, Truist Financial Corporation filed by W. A. Griffin, MD. (abm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Anthem, Inc., Other Affiliate Cerulean Companies, Inc., Other Affiliate Anthem Holding Corporation for Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc.. (Mann, Lindsey) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A - Southeastern Certificate of Coverage, #3 Exhibit B - Bronze HMO, #4 Exhibit C - Yardi Evidence of Coverage, #5 Exhibit D - FEP Brochure)(Mann, Lindsey) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to W. A. Griffin, MD re #2 Order. (abm) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 1/10/2022. (abm) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-11502375) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Fulton State Court Proceedings, #2 Exhibit -B -Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The William Carter Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Grady Memorial Hospital Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where CRESTLINE HOTELS & RESORTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Truist Financial Corporation is a litigant