This case was last updated from PACER on 11/26/2019 at 07:28:27 (UTC).

Griffin v. Bank of America, N.A. et al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2019 a Property - Other Real Property case was filed by Griffin against Bank of America, N A in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03679

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gray H Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony Griffin

Defendants

Bank of America, N.A.

Sebring Capital Partners

Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.

U.S. Bank National Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rhonda Shedrick Ross

Attorney at Attorney at Law

121 E 12Th St, Ste 6

Houston, TX 77008

Defendant Attorney

Rebekkah B Bodoff

Attorney at McGuire Woods

2000 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 1400

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 12/20/2019(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#5

(#5) STATEMENT of Facts by Bank of America, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, filed.(Bodoff, Rebekkah) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Bank of America, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, filed.(Bodoff, Rebekkah) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#3

(#3) Order in Removed Cases. Statement due within ten days. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bank of America, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, filed.(Bodoff, Rebekkah) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

1 #15

Exhibit 14

1 #14

Exhibit 13

1 #13

Exhibit 12

1 #12

Exhibit 11

1 #11

Exhibit 10

1 #10

Exhibit 9

1 #7

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County JDC, case number 189 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23258258) filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Bank of America, N.A., U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14)(Bodoff, Rebekkah) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 12/20/2019(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STATEMENT of Facts by Bank of America, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, filed.(Bodoff, Rebekkah) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Bank of America, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, filed.(Bodoff, Rebekkah) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order in Removed Cases. Statement due within ten days. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bank of America, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, filed.(Bodoff, Rebekkah) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County JDC, case number 189 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23258258) filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Bank of America, N.A., U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14)(Bodoff, Rebekkah) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.