This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/25/2020 at 07:32:48 (UTC).

Griffin v. Accordia Life and Annuity Company et al

Case Summary

On 11/26/2019 Griffin filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Accordia Life and Annuity Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeffrey U. Beaverstock and Sonja F. Bivins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01024

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey U. Beaverstock

Referral Judge

Sonja F. Bivins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Judson R. Griffin

Defendants

Accordia Life and Annuity Company

Frank Spell

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert H. Turner, Sr.

Attorney at Law Offices of Robert H. Turner

P.O. Box 929

Marion, AL 36756

Defendant Attorneys

Joshua Robert Hess

Attorney at Maynard, Cooper & Gale PC

1901 Sixth Avenue North, Ste 2400

Birmingham, AL 35203

James Ethan McDaniel

Attorney at Maynard, Cooper & Gale, LLC

1901 6Th Ave N., Ste. 2400

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Joint MOTION to Stay Rule 26 Deadlines filed by Accordia Life and Annuity Company. (Hess, Joshua) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

9 #2

Exhibit B - Death Certificate

9 #1

Exhibit A - Veatch Declaration

#9

(#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Accordia Life and Annuity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Veatch Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Death Certificate) (Hess, Joshua) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#8

(#8) SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Frank Spell by Accordia Life and Annuity Company. (Hess, Joshua) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

7 #1

Affidavit

#7

(#7) Brief filed by Judson R. Griffin re #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Judson R. Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Remand filed by Judson R. Griffin. (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by James Ethan McDaniel on behalf of Accordia Life and Annuity Company (McDaniel, James) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

4 #1

Consent Form

#4

(#4) PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 11/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (nah) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by Accordia Life and Annuity Company. (Hess, Joshua) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Accordia Life and Annuity Company. (Hess, Joshua) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

1 #6

Exhibit E - Letter re 2016 Policy

1 #5

Exhibit D - Application

1 #3

Exhibit B - Policy

1 #2

Exhibit A - State Court Filings

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Signed Civil Cover Sheet

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part parties' Joint Motion to Stay Deadlines #10 . For good cause shown, the deadline for the parties' Rule 26(f) obligations and initial disclosures are stayed until after the motion to remand is resolved. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 1/13/2020. (Bivins, Sonja) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 Joint MOTION to Stay Rule 26 Deadlines Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (nah) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Joint MOTION to Stay Rule 26 Deadlines filed by Accordia Life and Annuity Company. (Hess, Joshua) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REFERRAL OF #9 Response in Opposition to Motion to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Accordia Life and Annuity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Veatch Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Death Certificate) (Hess, Joshua) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REFERRAL OF #8 Suggestion of Death to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Frank Spell by Accordia Life and Annuity Company. (Hess, Joshua) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REFERRAL OF #7 Brief to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Remand to Judge Beaverstock (cmj) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Brief filed by Judson R. Griffin re #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Judson R. Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Remand filed by Judson R. Griffin. (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by James Ethan McDaniel on behalf of Accordia Life and Annuity Company (McDaniel, James) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 11/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (nah) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint by Accordia Life and Annuity Company. (Hess, Joshua) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Accordia Life and Annuity Company. (Hess, Joshua) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2519282, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Accordia Life and Annuity Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Signed Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Filings, #3 Exhibit B - Policy, #4 Exhibit C - Policy Delivery Receipt, #5 Exhibit D - Application, #6 Exhibit E - Letter re 2016 Policy) (Hess, Joshua) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Accordia Life and Annuity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Henry Turner, Jr.(Designation Retained)