Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/20/2021 at 08:39:59 (UTC).

Griffin et al v. Subaru of America Inc et al

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 Griffin filed an Other lawsuit against Subaru of America Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ann Marie Donio and Joseph H. Rodriguez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00873

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ann Marie Donio

Presiding Judge

Joseph H. Rodriguez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Roman Anderson

Robert Karrat

David Sroelov

KATHERINE GRIFFIN

Janet Oakley

DR. MARK GARDNER

Adam Whitley

Chiara Bancod-Hile

Defendants

Denso Corporation

SUBARU CORPORATION

Denso International America Inc

SUBARU OF AMERICA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TIMOTHY G. BLOOD

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

501 West Broadway, Suite 1490

San Diego, CA 92101

ADAM J LEVITT

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Ten North Dearborn Street, 11Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60602

DEMET BASAR

Attorney at BEASLEY ALLEN ET AL

218 Commerce St., Po Box 4160

Montgomery, AL 36103-4160

WILSON DANIEL MILES, III

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

218 Commerce Street, Po Box 4160

Montgomery, AL 36103-4160

Defendant Attorney

LEE EDMUNSON BAINS, JR.

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

1901 Sixth Avenue North, Suite 2400

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#45

(#45) CONSENT ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASES. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 2/2/2021. (tf, ) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#44

(#44) NOTICE of Appearance by DEMET BASAR on behalf of Chiara Bancod-Hile, MARK GARDNER, KATHERINE GRIFFIN, Robert Karrat, Janet Oakley, David Sroelov, Adam Whitley (BASAR, DEMET) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#43

(#43) Clerk's Letter: Attorneys not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to the attorneys' addresses. (dd, ) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

42 #1

*Restricted*

#42

(#42) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00563. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/19/2021)

#41

(#41) ORDER - Because this case satisfies the standard for transfer under 1404(a), the court GRANTS Plaintiffs' motion to transfer. Accordingly, the court DIRECTS the Clerk to TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 1/19/2021. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00563-ACA, 2:20-cv-01587-ACA(KEK) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

40 #2

Exhibit A

40 #1

Declaration in Support

#40

(#40) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Transfer re (39 in 2:20-cv-00563-ACA) MOTION to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S. 1404(a) by Roman Anderson, Roman Anderson, Chiara Bancod-Hile, Mark Gardner, Katherine Griffin, Robert Karrat, Janet Oakley, David Sroelov, Adam Whitley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00563-ACA, 2:20-cv-01587-ACA(Miles, Wilson) Modified on 12/17/2020 (KEK). (Entered: 12/17/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Clay Barnett, III on behalf of Katherine Griffin, Janet Oakley, Adam Whitley (Barnett, Henry) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by James Mitchell Williams on behalf of Katherine Griffin, Janet Oakley, Adam Whitley (Williams, James) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

2 #3

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

2 #2

Exhibit B Declaration of W. Daniel "Dee" Miles, III in Support

2 #1

Exhibit A Declaration of Demet Basar

#2

(#3) TEXT ORDER - The court GRANTS #2 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 5/7/20. (SAC) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3578305 (ALND B4601105560) related document #1 COMPLAINT against Denso Corporation, Denso International America Inc, Subaru Corporation, Subaru of America Inc, filed by Katherine Griffin, Janet Oakley, Adam Whitley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(KEK). (Miles, Wilson) Modified on 4/24/2020 (KEK). (Entered: 04/24/2020)

73 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2021
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated. (tf, ) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) CONSENT ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASES. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 2/2/2021. (tf, ) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) NOTICE of Appearance by DEMET BASAR on behalf of Chiara Bancod-Hile, MARK GARDNER, KATHERINE GRIFFIN, Robert Karrat, Janet Oakley, David Sroelov, Adam Whitley (BASAR, DEMET) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Clerk's Letter: Attorneys not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to the attorneys' addresses. (dd, ) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketJudge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, ) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00563. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) ORDER - Because this case satisfies the standard for transfer under 1404(a), the court GRANTS Plaintiffs' motion to transfer. Accordingly, the court DIRECTS the Clerk to TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 1/19/2021. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00563-ACA, 2:20-cv-01587-ACA(KEK) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Transfer re (39 in 2:20-cv-00563-ACA) MOTION to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S. 1404(a) by Roman Anderson, Roman Anderson, Chiara Bancod-Hile, Mark Gardner, Katherine Griffin, Robert Karrat, Janet Oakley, David Sroelov, Adam Whitley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00563-ACA, 2:20-cv-01587-ACA(Miles, Wilson) Modified on 12/17/2020 (KEK). (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MOTION to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S. 1404(a) by Roman Anderson, Roman Anderson, Chiara Bancod-Hile, Mark Gardner, Katherine Griffin, Robert Karrat, Janet Oakley, David Sroelov, Adam Whitley. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00563-ACA, 2:20-cv-01587-ACA(Miles, Wilson) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS Defendants unopposed motion for an extension of time to file a responsive pleading. (Doc. #37 ). All deadlines in this case are stayed until further order by the court. Defendants SHALL file a motion to transfer on or before December 24, 2020, or the court will lift the stay and set a new responsive pleading deadline. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 12/17/2020. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00563-ACA, 2:20-cv-01587-ACA(KEK) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Katherine Griffin, Janet Oakley, Adam Whitley. Denso International America Inc served on 6/12/2020, answer due 7/3/2020. (Miles, Wilson) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Katherine Griffin, Janet Oakley, Adam Whitley. Subaru of America Inc served on 6/12/2020, answer due 7/3/2020. (Miles, Wilson) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Denso Corporation (certified in English only pursuant to the Hague), Denso International America Inc, Subaru Corporation (certified in English only pursuant to the Hague), Subaru of America Inc. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (KEK) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Clay Barnett, III on behalf of Katherine Griffin, Janet Oakley, Adam Whitley (Barnett, Henry) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by James Mitchell Williams on behalf of Katherine Griffin, Janet Oakley, Adam Whitley (Williams, James) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) TEXT ORDER - The court GRANTS #2 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 5/7/20. (SAC) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketPHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3584975 (ALND B4601105787). (Basar, Demet) Modified on 5/7/2020 (KEK). (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro hac vice by Katherine Griffin, Janet Oakley, Adam Whitley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration of Demet Basar, #2 Exhibit B Declaration of W. Daniel "Dee" Miles, III in Support, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Basar, Demet) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3578305 (ALND B4601105560) related document #1 COMPLAINT against Denso Corporation, Denso International America Inc, Subaru Corporation, Subaru of America Inc, filed by Katherine Griffin, Janet Oakley, Adam Whitley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(KEK). (Miles, Wilson) Modified on 4/24/2020 (KEK). (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Denso Corporation, Denso International America Inc, Subaru Corporation, Subaru of America Inc, filed by Katherine Griffin, Janet Oakley, Adam Whitley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(KEK) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Denso Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where SUBARU CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Subaru of America, Inc., a New Jersey corporation is a litigant