This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/01/2021 at 09:13:18 (UTC).

Grier v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 Grier filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Experian Information Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Leonie M. Brinkema and John F. Anderson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00889

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonie M. Brinkema

Referral Judge

John F. Anderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kaileigh Grier

Defendant

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alexander Hugo Blankingship, III

Attorney at Blankingship & Christiano PC

11790 Sunrise Valley Drivesuite 103

Reston, VA 20191

Defendant Attorney

David Neal Anthony

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP (Richmond)

Troutman Sanders Bldg1001 Haxall Point

Richmond, VA 23219

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

4 #1

Exhibit 1 (Proposed Order)

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that Experian 's Consent Motion for an Extension of Time be, and hereby is, GRANTED. ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that Defendant, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., shall be GRANTED an extension of time until on or before October 1, 2021 to file its responsive pleadings, including its Answer to the Complaint filed by Kaileigh Grier. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 8/25/2021. (kgall) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Anthony, David) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings, Including Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Order))(Anthony, David) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued for service by SPS as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (swil) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons by Kaileigh Grier. (Blankingship, Alexander) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7922734.), filed by Kaileigh Grier. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Blankingship, Alexander) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David N. Anthony