This case was last updated from PACER on 11/16/2019 at 07:56:43 (UTC).

GRIER v. ALLEN, et al.

Case Summary

On 09/17/2019 GRIER filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against ALLEN. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF and W LOUIS SANDS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:19-CV-00156

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF

Presiding Judge

W LOUIS SANDS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LASHAWN DEANGELO GRIER

Reidsville, GA 30499

Defendants

LIBRARIAN ADRIAN NELSON

MARTY ALLEN

STAN SHEPARD

GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

TACT OFFICER MOSS

STEVE UPTON

TACT COMMANDER MOSS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

WILLIAM PETERS

40 Capitol Sq Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STEVE UPTON. as to STEVE UPTON (PETERS, WILLIAM) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#20

(#20) USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for MOSS, STEVE UPTON. (rlw) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

19 #1

USM 285 issued for Tact Commander Moss

#19

(#19) USM 285 Process Receipt and Return ISSUED for STEVE UPTON. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 issued for Tact Commander Moss)(rlw) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#18

(#18) ORDER Directing Service on Defendants. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 9/26/2019. (TQL) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#17

(#17) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to LASHAWN DEANGELO GRIER (rlw) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#16

(#16) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (rlw) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

15 #1

*Restricted*

#15

(#15) Case transferred in District Transfer from District of Georgia Southern; Case Number 6:18-cv-00052. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.** (Entered: 09/17/2019)

7 #3

Exhibit C

7 #1

Exhibit A

#7

(#7) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge R. Stan Baker for all further proceedings. Chief Judge J. Randal Hall no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 9/4/18. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (trb) [Transferred from gasd on 9/17/2019.] (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Lashawn Deangelo Grier. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 7/17/2018. (ca) [Transferred from gasd on 9/17/2019.] (Entered: 07/17/2018)

5 #1

Envelope

#5

(#5) CONSENT by Prisoner Lashawn Deangelo Grier to collection of fees. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ca) [Transferred from gasd on 9/17/2019.] (Entered: 07/02/2018)

#3

(#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. PLRA due by 7/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 6/15/2018. (ca) [Transferred from gasd on 9/17/2019.] (Entered: 06/15/2018)

#2

(#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. PLRA due by 7/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 6/15/2018. (ca) [Transferred from gasd on 9/17/2019.] (Entered: 06/15/2018)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STEVE UPTON. as to STEVE UPTON (PETERS, WILLIAM) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for MOSS, STEVE UPTON. (rlw) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) USM 285 Process Receipt and Return ISSUED for STEVE UPTON. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 issued for Tact Commander Moss)(rlw) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER Directing Service on Defendants. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 9/26/2019. (TQL) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to LASHAWN DEANGELO GRIER (rlw) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (rlw) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS and US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF added. (rlw) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Case transferred in District Transfer from District of Georgia Southern; Case Number 6:18-cv-00052. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.** (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER ADOPTING re #13 Report and Recommendations. The Court DISMISSES Plaintiffs Georgia State Prison claims, TRANSFERS Plaintiffs Valdosta State Prison claims (against Defendants Upton and Moss) to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Georgia, DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to enter the appropriate judgment of dismissal and CLOSE this case in this District, and DENIES Plaintiff leave to appeal in forma pauperis as to his Georgia State Prison claims. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 9/16/19. (loh) [Transferred from gasd on 9/17/2019.] (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court DISMISS all of Plaintiff's GSP Claims and TRANSFER Plaintiff's VSP Claim to the District Court for the Middle District of Georgia re #1 Complaint. It is further RECOMMENDED the Court DENY Plaintiff in forma pauperis status on appeal as to the claims recommended for dismissal. The Court ORDERS any party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation to file specific written objections within 14 days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered. (Objections to R&R due by 8/29/2019). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 8/15/2019. (ca) [Transferred from gasd on 9/17/2019.] (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Amend re #1 Complaint by Lashawn Deangelo Grier. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(loh) [Transferred from gasd on 9/17/2019.] (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Letter from Lashawn Grier. (jrb) [Transferred from gasd on 9/17/2019.] (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro per Order in case MC118-12. Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker-MJ no longer assigned to the case. (wwp) [Transferred from gasd on 9/17/2019.] (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge R. Stan Baker for all further proceedings. Chief Judge J. Randal Hall no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 9/4/18. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (trb) [Transferred from gasd on 9/17/2019.] (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Lashawn Deangelo Grier. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 7/17/2018. (ca) [Transferred from gasd on 9/17/2019.] (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CONSENT by Prisoner Lashawn Deangelo Grier to collection of fees. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ca) [Transferred from gasd on 9/17/2019.] (Entered: 07/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Lashawn Deangelo Grier. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ca) [Transferred from gasd on 9/17/2019.] (Entered: 07/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. PLRA due by 7/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 6/15/2018. (ca) [Transferred from gasd on 9/17/2019.] (Entered: 06/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lashawn Deangelo Grier. REFERRED to Judge R. Stan Baker.(loh) [Transferred from gasd on 9/17/2019.] (Entered: 04/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lashawn Deangelo Grier.(loh) [Transferred from gasd on 9/17/2019.] (Entered: 04/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS is a litigant