This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/20/2021 at 12:41:00 (UTC).

Gridley IP LLC v. SuperShuttle International, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/22/2020 Gridley IP LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against SuperShuttle International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01742

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gridley IP LLC

Defendant

SuperShuttle International, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jimmy C. Chong

Attorney at The Chong Law Firm, P.A.

2961 Centerville Road, Suite 350

Wilmington, DE 19808

Howard L. Wernow

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Related Cases

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED (ntl) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gridley IP LLC as to SuperShuttle International, Inc. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 01/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gridley IP LLC. SuperShuttle International, Inc. served on 12/23/2020, answer due 1/13/2021. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Howard L. Wernow for Gridley IP LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01738-LPS, 1:20-cv-01741-LPS, 1:20-cv-01742-LPS, 1:20-cv-01743-LPS(kmd) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re (6 in 1:20-cv-01742-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard L. Wernow filed by Gridley IP LLC, (6 in 1:20-cv-01738-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard L. Wernow filed by Gridley IP LLC, (6 in 1:20-cv-01741-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard L. Wernow filed by Gridley IP LLC, (6 in 1:20-cv-01743-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard L. Wernow filed by Gridley IP LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/29/20. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01738-LPS, 1:20-cv-01741-LPS, 1:20-cv-01742-LPS, 1:20-cv-01743-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard L. Wernow - filed by Gridley IP LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01738-LPS, 1:20-cv-01741-LPS, 1:20-cv-01742-LPS, 1:20-cv-01743-LPS (rjb) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mal) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Gridley IP LLC. (mal) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,676,668 ;US 9,852,435. (mal) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR INFRINGEMENT OF PATENT - filed with Jury Demand against SuperShuttle International, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3413799.) - filed by Gridley IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Related Cases)(mal) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gridley IP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SuperShuttle International, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Howard L. Wernow

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jimmy C. Chong