This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:15:48 (UTC).

Ethan Grider et al v. Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Ethan Grider filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Otis D. Wright, II and Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-10342

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Otis D. Wright, II

Referral Judge

Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ethan Grider

Kevin Terry

Defendants

Bayer Healthcare LLC

Beiersdorf, Inc.

Beiersdorf AG

Bayer AG

Beiersdorf North America, Inc.

Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shireen M Clarkson

Attorney at Clarkson Law Firm PC

9255 Sunset Boulevard Suite 804

Los Angeles, CA 90069

Celine Cohan

Attorney at Clarkson Law Firm PC

9255 Sunset Boulevard Suite 804

Los Angeles, CA 90069

Kevin O Moon

Attorney at Moon Law APC

600 West Broadway Suite 700

San Diego, CA 92101

Christopher D Moon

Attorney at Moon Law APC

600 West Broadway Suite 700

San Diego, CA 92101

Ryan J Clarkson

Attorney at Clarkson Law Firm PC

9255 Sunset Boulevard Suite 804

Los Angeles, CA 90069

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs Ethan Grider, Kevin Terry. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Clarkson, Shireen) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#8

(#8) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information.The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing onthe voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. (jtil) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Ethan Grider, Kevin Terry, (Clarkson, Shireen) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (jtil) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiffs Ethan Grider, Kevin Terry. (Clarkson, Shireen) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24904711 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Kevin Terry, Ethan Grider. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Shireen M Clarkson added to party Ethan Grider(pty:pla), Attorney Shireen M Clarkson added to party Kevin Terry(pty:pla))(Clarkson, Shireen) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#10

(#10) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Pursuant to Plaintiffs Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #9 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1):IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The entire action and all claims asserted therein are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. All dates and deadlines in this action are VACATED and taken off calendar.The Clerk of the Court shall close this case. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Ethan Grider, Kevin Terry. (Clarkson, Shireen) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Pursuant to Plaintiffs Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #9 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1):IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The entire action and all claims asserted therein are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. All dates and deadlines in this action are VACATED and taken off calendar.The Clerk of the Court shall close this case. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs Ethan Grider, Kevin Terry. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Clarkson, Shireen) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information.The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing onthe voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. (jtil) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (jtil) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Ethan Grider, Kevin Terry, (Clarkson, Shireen) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiffs Ethan Grider, Kevin Terry. (Clarkson, Shireen) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Ethan Grider, Kevin Terry. (Clarkson, Shireen) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24904711 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Kevin Terry, Ethan Grider. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Shireen M Clarkson added to party Ethan Grider(pty:pla), Attorney Shireen M Clarkson added to party Kevin Terry(pty:pla))(Clarkson, Shireen) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.