This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/06/2022 at 08:06:07 (UTC).

G.R.F. v. New York City Department of Education

Case Summary

On 01/05/2022 G R F filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against New York City Department of Education. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John P. Cronan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00102

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John P. Cronan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

G.R.F.

Defendant

New York City Department of Education

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven J. Alizio

Attorney at The Law Office of Steven Alizio, PLLC

43 West 43Rd Streetste 248

New York, NY 10036-7424

Defendant Attorney

Sherry Nicole Glover

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against New York City Department of Education. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25546453)Document filed by G.R.F...(Alizio, Steven) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Alizio, Steven) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by G.R.F...(Alizio, Steven) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department of Education..(pc) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. New York City Department of Education served on 1/7/2022, answer due 1/28/2022. Service was made by Email. Document filed by G.R.F...(Alizio, Steven) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#6

(#6) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint (on consent) addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Sherry N. Glover dated January 27, 2022. Document filed by New York City Department of Education..(Glover, Sherry) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint (on consent). This request is granted. Defendant shall answer, or otherwise respond to, the Complaint by March 29, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 1/28/2022) (jca) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: New York City Department of Education answer due 3/29/2022. (jca) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint (on consent). This request is granted. Defendant shall answer, or otherwise respond to, the Complaint by March 29, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 1/28/2022) (jca) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint (on consent) addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Sherry N. Glover dated January 27, 2022. Document filed by New York City Department of Education..(Glover, Sherry) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. New York City Department of Education served on 1/7/2022, answer due 1/28/2022. Service was made by Email. Document filed by G.R.F...(Alizio, Steven) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department of Education..(pc) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by G.R.F...(Alizio, Steven) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Alizio, Steven) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against New York City Department of Education. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25546453)Document filed by G.R.F...(Alizio, Steven) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where New York City Department of Education is a litigant