This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/01/2019 at 07:25:38 (UTC).

GURBIR S. GREWAL, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY et al v. 3M COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 07/03/2019 GURBIR S GREWAL, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against 3M COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Zahid N. Quraishi and Freda L. Wolfson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-14734

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Zahid N. Quraishi

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ATTORNEY GENERAL GURBIR S. GREWAL

Trenton, NJ 08625-0093

PAUL R. RODRIGUEZ

NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION

GURBIR S. GREWAL, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY

Defendants

ABC CORPORATIONS

BUCKEYE FIRE EQUIPMENT COMPANY

NATIONAL FOAM, INC.

E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY

THE CHEMOURS COMPANY

CHEMGUARD, INC.

3M COMPANY

KIDDE-FENWAL, INC.

TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GWEN FARLEY

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

25 Market Street, P.O. Box 093

Trenton, NJ 08625

LEONARD Z. KAUFMANN

Attorney at COHN, LIFLAND, PEARLMAN, HERRMANN & KNOPF, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

ELLEN NUNNO CORBO

Attorney at TAYLOR COLICCHIO LLP

100 Canal Pointe Blvd, Suite 125

Princeton, NJ 08540

KEITH E. SMITH

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

1717 Arch Street, Suite 400

Philadelphia, PA 19103

NICOLE GERRITSEN MCDONOUGH

Attorney at ARCHER & GREINER P.C.

21 Main Street, Court Plaza South - West Wing, Suite 353

Hackensack, NJ 07601

THOMAS JOHN HERTEN

Attorney at ARCHER & GREINER P.C.

21 Main Street, Suite 353

Hackensack, NJ 07601

DONALD J. CAMERSON, II

Attorney at BRESSLER, AMERY & ROSS, ESQS.

325 Columbia Turnpike, Po Box 1980

Florham Park, NJ 07932

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #6

Exhibit F

#2

#3

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • Case transferred from New Jersey has been opened in District of South Carolina as case 2:19-cv-02199, filed 08/06/2019. (dm ) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Case extracted via ECF to District of South Caroina. (gh, ) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the District of South Carolina. (MDL 2873 CTO #14 Judge Richard M. Gergel) (gh, ) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by LEONARD Z. KAUFMANN on behalf of NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION, GURBIR S. GREWAL, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY, PAUL R. RODRIGUEZ (KAUFMANN, LEONARD) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/26/2019 at 11:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7W before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 07/09/2019. (jmh) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (jdb) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP, CHEMGUARD, INC. from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, MERCER COUNTY case number MER-L953-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9792255), filed by TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP, CHEMGUARD, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(HERTEN, THOMAS) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION is a litigant

Latest cases where E.I. Dupont De Nemours and Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. is a litigant