This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:04:16 (UTC).

Greuner Medical, PC v. United Healthcare Services, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Greuner Medical, PC filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against United Healthcare Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Eric N. Vitaliano and Sanket J. Bulsara. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-06879

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eric N. Vitaliano

Referral Judge

Sanket J. Bulsara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Greuner Medical, PC

Defendants

Pfizer

United Healthcare Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Baglio, I

Attorney at Lewin & Baglio, LLP.

1100 Shames Drive, Suite 100

Westbury, NY 11590

Defendant Attorney

Tomasz Pacholec

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

200 Connell Drive, Suite 2000

Berkeley Heights, NJ 07922

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER: As per #6 STIPULATION of Dismissal, this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. So Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 1/3/2020. (Almonte, Giselle) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Pfizer (Pacholec, Tomasz) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#5

(#5) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond by Pfizer. (Pacholec, Tomasz) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#2

(#2) DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Pfizer. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

1 #4

Certificate of Service

1 #3

Corporate Disclosure

1 #2

Notice of Compliance

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pfizer from Supreme Court of The State of New York County of Queens, case number 716554/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12133908) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Compliance, #3 Corporate Disclosure, #4 Certificate of Service) (Pacholec, Tomasz) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: As per #6 STIPULATION of Dismissal, this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. So Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 1/3/2020. (Almonte, Giselle) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Pfizer (Pacholec, Tomasz) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #5 is granted. Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 12/27/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 12/17/2019. (Guo, Alicia) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond by Pfizer. (Pacholec, Tomasz) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 12/12/2019. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Pfizer. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pfizer from Supreme Court of The State of New York County of Queens, case number 716554/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12133908) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Compliance, #3 Corporate Disclosure, #4 Certificate of Service) (Pacholec, Tomasz) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less