This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/01/2020 at 11:02:54 (UTC).

Greuner Medical, PC v. Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 04/02/2020 Greuner Medical, PC filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Orenstein and William F. Kuntz, II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01672

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

James Orenstein

Presiding Judge

William F. Kuntz, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Greuner Medical, PC

Defendants

Aircraft Services Group, Inc.

Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Baglio, I

Attorney at Lewin & Baglio, LLP.

1100 Shames Drive, Suite 100

Westbury, NY 11590

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher C. Loeber

Attorney at Adler & Gross, P.C.

225 Broadway, Suite 2400

New York, NY 10007

Michael Bardwell Adelman

Attorney at Pryor Cashman LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Patrick W. Begos

Attorney at Robinson & Cole LLP

1055 Washington Blvd

Stamford, CT 06901

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER: On May 6, 2020, Defendant Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company ("Cigna") filed a request for a pre-motion conference for an anticipated motion to dismiss. ECF No. #6 . On May 7, 2020, Aircraft Services Group, Inc. ("ASG," and collectively with Cigna, "Defendants") joined in Cigna's request for a pre-motion conference for an anticipated motion to dismiss. ECF No. #8 . The Court hereby denies Defendants' request for a pre-motion conference as moot and GRANTS leave to file the anticipated motions to dismiss. The Court hereby orders the following briefing schedule regarding Defendants' motions to dismiss: Defendants shall submit their motions and briefing on all related issues no later than Friday, June 12, 2020 by 5:00 P.M.; Plaintiff shall submit a response to the motions no later than Friday, July 24, 2020 by 5:00 P.M.; Defendants shall submit a reply, if any, no later than Friday, August 21, 2020 by 5:00 P.M. As a courtesy to the Court, the Court requests that the parties refrain from filing motion papers until the motion has been fully briefed. If the parties elect to file their motion only once it is fully briefed, the notice of motion and all supporting papers are to be served on the other party along with a cover letter setting forth whom the movant represents and the papers being served. Only a copy of the cover letter shall be electronically filed in advance of the fully briefed motion, and it must be filed as a letter, not as a motion. On the day the motions are fully briefed, each party shall electronically file their individual motion papers by 5:00 P.M. on August 21, 2020. Defendants shall also mail a complete set of courtesy copies of all motion papers, via overnight mail, to the Court, attention of Ms. Alexis Love. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 5/7/2020. (Love, Alexis) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Bardwell Adelman on behalf of Aircraft Services Group, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Adelman, Michael) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

#8

(#8) REPLY in Support re #6 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference regarding Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company's Anticipated Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint in its entirety filed by Aircraft Services Group, Inc.. (Loeber, Christopher) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher C. Loeber on behalf of Aircraft Services Group, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Loeber, Christopher) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

#6

(#6) Letter MOTION for pre motion conference regarding Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company's Anticipated Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint in its entirety by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Begos, Patrick) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

5 #2

Exhibit B-E-mails

5 #1

Exhibit A-Proposed Protective Order

#5

(#5) Letter MOTION for Protective Order by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Protective Order, #2 Exhibit B-E-mails) (Begos, Patrick) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#4

(#4) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Begos, Patrick) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

#3

(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

#2

(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C- Additional pleadings from state court action

1 #2

Exhibit B-Business Record Details of Plaintiff

1 #1

Exhibit A-Amended Summons and Amended Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company from Supreme Court of the State of New York-Queens County, case number Index No. 700736/2020. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12626106) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Amended Summons and Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Business Record Details of Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit C- Additional pleadings from state court action, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Begos, Patrick) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER: On May 6, 2020, Defendant Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company ("Cigna") filed a request for a pre-motion conference for an anticipated motion to dismiss. ECF No. #6 . On May 7, 2020, Aircraft Services Group, Inc. ("ASG," and collectively with Cigna, "Defendants") joined in Cigna's request for a pre-motion conference for an anticipated motion to dismiss. ECF No. #8 . The Court hereby denies Defendants' request for a pre-motion conference as moot and GRANTS leave to file the anticipated motions to dismiss. The Court hereby orders the following briefing schedule regarding Defendants' motions to dismiss: Defendants shall submit their motions and briefing on all related issues no later than Friday, June 12, 2020 by 5:00 P.M.; Plaintiff shall submit a response to the motions no later than Friday, July 24, 2020 by 5:00 P.M.; Defendants shall submit a reply, if any, no later than Friday, August 21, 2020 by 5:00 P.M. As a courtesy to the Court, the Court requests that the parties refrain from filing motion papers until the motion has been fully briefed. If the parties elect to file their motion only once it is fully briefed, the notice of motion and all supporting papers are to be served on the other party along with a cover letter setting forth whom the movant represents and the papers being served. Only a copy of the cover letter shall be electronically filed in advance of the fully briefed motion, and it must be filed as a letter, not as a motion. On the day the motions are fully briefed, each party shall electronically file their individual motion papers by 5:00 P.M. on August 21, 2020. Defendants shall also mail a complete set of courtesy copies of all motion papers, via overnight mail, to the Court, attention of Ms. Alexis Love. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 5/7/2020. (Love, Alexis) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aircraft Services Group, Inc. (Adelman, Michael) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Bardwell Adelman on behalf of Aircraft Services Group, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Adelman, Michael) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPLY in Support re #6 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference regarding Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company's Anticipated Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint in its entirety filed by Aircraft Services Group, Inc.. (Loeber, Christopher) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher C. Loeber on behalf of Aircraft Services Group, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Loeber, Christopher) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter MOTION for pre motion conference regarding Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company's Anticipated Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint in its entirety by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Begos, Patrick) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #5 Motion for Protective Order -- The stipulated protective order, Exhibit A to Docket Entry #5 , is so ordered. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 5/4/2020. (Gutmann, Joseph) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter MOTION for Protective Order by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Protective Order, #2 Exhibit B-E-mails) (Begos, Patrick) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer -- The motion is granted on consent; Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by May 18, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 4/8/2020. (Gutmann, Joseph) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Begos, Patrick) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company from Supreme Court of the State of New York-Queens County, case number Index No. 700736/2020. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12626106) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Amended Summons and Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Business Record Details of Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit C- Additional pleadings from state court action, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Begos, Patrick) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Greuner Medical, PC is a litigant

Latest cases where CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Baglio, I