This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:47:19 (UTC).

Gress v. Employee Awareness Association, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Gress filed an Other lawsuit against Employee Awareness Association, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Virginia M. Kendall. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03339

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia M. Kendall

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dr. William P. Gress

William P. Gress

Defendants

John Does 1-10

Employee Awareness Association, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel A. Edelman

Attorney at Edelman, Combs, Latturner & Goodwin LLC

20 South Clark Street, Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60603

Heather A. Kolbus

Attorney at Edelman, Combs, Latturner & Goodwin, LLC

20 South Clark Street, Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60603

Cathleen M. Combs

Attorney at Edelman, Combs, Latturner & Goodwin LLC

20 South Clark Street, Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Dr. William P. Gress; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15838043. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dr. William P. Gress by Cathleen M. Combs (Combs, Cathleen) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dr. William P. Gress by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#7

(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 7/18/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 7/15/2019. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. On the Court's own Motion, Initial Status hearing set for 7/18/2019 is reset for 8/7/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dr. William P. Gress by Heather A. Kolbus (Kolbus, Heather) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by William P. Gress as to Employee Awareness Association, LLC on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. (Kolbus, Heather) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#9

(#9) STATUS Report Initial Status Report by William P. Gress (Kolbus, Heather) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STATUS Report Initial Status Report by William P. Gress (Kolbus, Heather) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. On the Court's own Motion, Initial Status hearing set for 7/18/2019 is reset for 8/7/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 7/18/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 7/15/2019. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by William P. Gress as to Employee Awareness Association, LLC on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. (Kolbus, Heather) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Employee Awareness Association, LLC. (ew, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dr. William P. Gress by Heather A. Kolbus (Kolbus, Heather) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dr. William P. Gress by Cathleen M. Combs (Combs, Cathleen) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dr. William P. Gress by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Dr. William P. Gress; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15838043. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.