This case was last updated from PACER on 09/26/2020 at 07:57:27 (UTC).

Gress v. Commonwealth Edison Co

Case Summary

On 07/28/2020 Gress filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Commonwealth Edison Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jorge L. Alonso. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04405

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jorge L. Alonso

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lawrence H Gress

Movant

Defendants

COMMONWEALTH EDISON CO

John Does 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Irving Leonard

Attorney at LeonardMeyer LLP

120 North Lasalle, Suite 2000

Chicago, IL 60602

Derek W Loeser

Attorney at Keller Rohrback, LLP

1201 Third Avenue, Suite 3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Kent Maynard, Jr.

Attorney at Kent Maynard & Associates LLC

53 West Jackson Boulevard, Suite 1240

Chicago, IL 60604-3632

Ryan Patrick McDevitt

Attorney at Keller Rohrback LLP

1201 3Rd Ave, Suite 3200

Seattle, WA 98101

Gary A. Gotto

Attorney at Keller Rohrback L.L.P.

3101 N. Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Rebecca Susan Chacko

Attorney at Leonardmeyer, Llp

120 N Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60602

Ariel Olstein

Attorney at Chanen & Olstein

7373 Lincoln Ave. Ste. 100

Lincolnwood, IL 60712

Stuart Jay Chanen

Attorney at Chanen & Olstein

7373 Lincoln Ave. Ste. 100

Lincolnwood, IL 60712

Defendant Attorneys

Terrence Joseph Truax

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

353 N. Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Gayle Littleton

Attorney at Jenner & Block Llp

353 N. Clark St.

Chicago, IL 60654

E. Glenn Rippie

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

353 N. Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60654-6974

Matthew E. Price

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

1099 New York Ave., Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20001-4412

 

Court Documents

#40

(#40) MOTION by Defendant Commonwealth Edison Co for extension of time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead in Response to Complaint (Agreed) (Truax, Terrence) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

39 #1

Exhibit A - South Branch Complaint

#39

(#39) MOTION by Defendant Commonwealth Edison Co to reassign case - Motion to Reassign Related Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - South Branch Complaint)(Truax, Terrence) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#38

(#38) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Movant by Ariel Olstein (Olstein, Ariel) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#37

(#37) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Movant by Stuart Jay Chanen (Chanen, Stuart) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#36

(#36) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso:Set deadlines/hearing as to motion for leave to appear #34 : Motion Hearing date set for 9/24/20 #35 is stricken and reset to telephonic motion hearing on 10/6/20 at 9:30 a.m. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 888-808-6929 and the access code is 4911854. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#35

(#35) Potter Plaintiffs' NOTICE of Motion by Stuart Jay Chanen for presentment of motion for leave to appear #34 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/24/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Chanen, Stuart) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

34 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#34

(#34) Potter Plaintiffs' MOTION by Plaintiff Movant for leave to appear as interested parties in preliminary matters Potter Plaintiffs' (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chanen, Stuart) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#10

(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lawrence H Gress by Gary A. Gotto (Amended) (Gotto, Gary) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17300339. (McDevitt, Ryan) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lawrence H Gress by Gary A. Gotto (Gotto, Gary) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lawrence H Gress by Derek W Loeser (Loeser, Derek) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Lawrence H Gress. Commonwealth Edison Co waiver sent on 8/2/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (Leonard, Michael) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) (sxb, ). (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lawrence H Gress by Kent Maynard, Jr (Maynard, Kent) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#3

(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Leonard, Michael) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lawrence H Gress by Michael Irving Leonard (Leonard, Michael) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Commonwealth Edison filed by Lawrence H Gress; JURY DEMAND. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17258694.(Leonard, Michael) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) MOTION by Defendant Commonwealth Edison Co for extension of time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead in Response to Complaint (Agreed) (Truax, Terrence) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MOTION by Defendant Commonwealth Edison Co to reassign case - Motion to Reassign Related Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - South Branch Complaint)(Truax, Terrence) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Movant by Ariel Olstein (Olstein, Ariel) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Movant by Stuart Jay Chanen (Chanen, Stuart) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso:Set deadlines/hearing as to motion for leave to appear #34 : Motion Hearing date set for 9/24/20 #35 is stricken and reset to telephonic motion hearing on 10/6/20 at 9:30 a.m. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 888-808-6929 and the access code is 4911854. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Potter Plaintiffs' NOTICE of Motion by Stuart Jay Chanen for presentment of motion for leave to appear #34 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/24/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Chanen, Stuart) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Potter Plaintiffs' MOTION by Plaintiff Movant for leave to appear as interested parties in preliminary matters Potter Plaintiffs' (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chanen, Stuart) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Motion hearing set for 9/22/20 is stricken and reset to telephonic motion hearing on 10/6/20 at 9:30 a.m. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 888-808-6929 and the access code is 4911854. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MOTION by Plaintiff Lawrence H Gress for attorney representation re-file Rule 23(g) Motion (Leonard, Michael) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE of Motion by Michael Irving Leonard for presentment of motion for attorney representation, #30 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/22/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Leonard, Michael) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lawrence H Gress by Gary A. Gotto (Amended) (Gotto, Gary) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17300339. (McDevitt, Ryan) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lawrence H Gress by Gary A. Gotto (Gotto, Gary) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lawrence H Gress by Derek W Loeser (Loeser, Derek) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Lawrence H Gress. Commonwealth Edison Co waiver sent on 8/2/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (Leonard, Michael) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) (sxb, ). (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lawrence H Gress by Kent Maynard, Jr (Maynard, Kent) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, ) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Leonard, Michael) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lawrence H Gress by Michael Irving Leonard (Leonard, Michael) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Commonwealth Edison filed by Lawrence H Gress; JURY DEMAND. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17258694.(Leonard, Michael) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less