This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/23/2021 at 07:51:59 (UTC).

Gresham et al v. Alcona County Community Schools Board of Education et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 Gresham filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Alcona County Community Schools Board of Education. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia T. Morris and Thomas L. Ludington. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-12251

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patricia T. Morris

Presiding Judge

Thomas L. Ludington

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Stephanie Gresham

Glennie, MI 48737

M.G.

5822 Bamfield Rd.

Glennie, MI 48737

S.G.

5822 Bamfield Rd.

Glennie, MI 48737

R.G.

5822 Bamfiled Rd.

Glennie, MI 48737

K.G.

5822 Bamfield Rd.

Glennie, MI 48737

Defendants

Alcona County Community Schools Board of Education

Dan O'Connor

Chad Spitznagel

Warren MacNeil

Erika Rice

Vicki Hansen

Joel Blohm

Brandon Schroeder

Steve Yokom

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Timothy J. Mullins

Attorney at Giarmarco, Mullins & Horton, P.C.

101 W. Big Beaver Rd., 10Th Floor

Troy, MI 48084

Travis M. Comstock

Attorney at Giarmarco, Mullins & Horton, P.C.

101 W Big Beaver Rd., Suite 1000

Troy, MI 48084

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) OPINION and ORDER Dismissing Case Without Prejudice. ( #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Terminated.) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#16

(#16) JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Travis M. Comstock on behalf of All Defendants. (Comstock, Travis) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Mullins on behalf of All Defendants. (Mullins, Timothy) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

#14

(#14) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Warren MacNeil served on 9/27/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (TTho) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

#13

(#13) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Vicki Hansen served on 9/27/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (TTho) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Steve Yokom served on 9/27/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (TTho) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Joel Blohm served on 9/27/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (TTho) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Erika Rice served on 9/27/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (TTho) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Dan O'Connor served on 9/27/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (TTho) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Chad Spitznagel served on 9/27/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (TTho) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Brandon Schroeder served on 9/27/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (TTho) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

#3

#2

1 #2

Document Continuation

1 #1

Document Continuation

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #15 Opinion & Order, and #16 Judgment on Stephanie A. Gresham, 5822 Bamfiled Rd., Glennie, MI 48737. (KWin) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) OPINION and ORDER Dismissing Case Without Prejudice. ( #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Terminated.) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Travis M. Comstock on behalf of All Defendants. (Comstock, Travis) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Mullins on behalf of All Defendants. (Mullins, Timothy) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Warren MacNeil served on 9/27/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (TTho) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Vicki Hansen served on 9/27/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (TTho) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Steve Yokom served on 9/27/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (TTho) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Joel Blohm served on 9/27/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (TTho) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Erika Rice served on 9/27/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (TTho) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Dan O'Connor served on 9/27/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (TTho) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Chad Spitznagel served on 9/27/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (TTho) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Brandon Schroeder served on 9/27/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (TTho) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketFILING FEE Received in the amount of 402.00 by Stephanie Gresham - Receipt No. DET137540 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (BHan) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *Joel Blohm, Vicki Hansen, Warren MacNeil, Dan O'Connor, Erika Rice, Brandon Schroeder, Chad Spitznagel, Steve Yokom* (DPer) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for temporary restraining order by Stephanie Gresham, K.G., M.G., R.G., S.G. (DPer) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by S.G., M.G., Stephanie Gresham, R.G., K.G. against defendants; fee paid. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation, #2 Document Continuation) (DPer) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SG is a litigant

Latest cases where R.G. is a litigant

Latest cases where K.G. is a litigant

Latest cases where M G A Ins Co Inc is a litigant