This case was last updated from PACER on 05/30/2021 at 07:39:45 (UTC).

Thomas Grenon v. FCA US LLC

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 Thomas Grenon filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shashi H. Kewalramani and Josephine L. Staton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00560

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Shashi H. Kewalramani

Presiding Judge

Josephine L. Staton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas Grenon

Defendants

FCA US LLC

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin Y Jacobson

Attorney at Quill and Arrow LLP

10900 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Athena Bao Nhi Nguyen

Attorney at Quill and Arrow LLP

10900 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Renia Zadourian

Attorney at Quill and Arrow Law Firm

10900 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Defendant Attorneys

Mark W Skanes

Attorney at RoseWaldorf LLP

100 Oceangate Suite 300

Long Beach, CA 90802

Michael J Gregg

Attorney at RoseWaldorf LLP

100 Oceangate Suite 300

Long Beach, CA 90802

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2021 at 10:30 a.m. See Order for details. (mku) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#11

(#11) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge John W. Holcomb and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 21-01, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Josephine L. Staton. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:21-cv-00560 JLS (SHKx). (esa) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym to Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 5:21-cv-00560 JWH (SHKx). (esa) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#8

(#8) STATEMENT of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant FCA US LLC (Skanes, Mark) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#6

(#6) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #5 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #4 served on March 31, 2021. (Skanes, Mark) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#5

(#5) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark W Skanes counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC. Adding Michael J. Gregg as counsel of record for FCA US LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Skanes, Mark) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#4

(#4) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark W Skanes counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC. Adding Mark W. Skanes as counsel of record for FCA US LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Skanes, Mark) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA North America Holdings LLC; FCA Holdco B.V.; Stellantis N.V.. (Skanes, Mark) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Skanes, Mark) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2021 at 10:30 a.m. See Order for details. (mku) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge John W. Holcomb and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 21-01, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Josephine L. Staton. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:21-cv-00560 JLS (SHKx). (esa) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym to Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 5:21-cv-00560 JWH (SHKx). (esa) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STATEMENT of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant FCA US LLC (Skanes, Mark) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, FCA US LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Thomas Grenon. (FILED IN RIVERSIDE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 2/11/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #5 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #4 served on March 31, 2021. (Skanes, Mark) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark W Skanes counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC. Adding Michael J. Gregg as counsel of record for FCA US LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Skanes, Mark) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark W Skanes counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC. Adding Mark W. Skanes as counsel of record for FCA US LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Skanes, Mark) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA North America Holdings LLC; FCA Holdco B.V.; Stellantis N.V.. (Skanes, Mark) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Skanes, Mark) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside County Superior Court, case number CVRI2100691 Receipt No: ACACDC-31020934 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Skanes in Support of FCA US LLC's Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F) (Attorney Mark W Skanes added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Skanes, Mark) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin Y. Jacobson