This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/12/2021 at 09:20:40 (UTC).

Gremmels v. Somkin et al

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 Gremmels filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Somkin. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph C. Spero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-05395

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph C. Spero

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christian Gremmels

San Francisco, CA 94102

Defendants

M.D. Anthony Somkin

Sutter Health

Cialis Eli Lilly & Company

Walgreens Co.

John George Hospital

Oakland Police Department

San Francisco Police Department

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Mail sent to Christian Gremmels returned as undeliverable re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2021) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Mail sent to Christian Gremmels returned as undeliverable re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2021) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE. The court has reviewed the Sua Sponte Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship and determined that no cases are related and no reassignments shall occur. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)Copy placed in O:Drive on 8/27/2021 (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER OF SUA SPONTE REFERRAL for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 21-cv-06073-SK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 8/25/2021. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Service will be determined separately. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Copy placed in O:Drive on 7/30/2021. (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Christian Gremmels. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2021) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Christian Gremmels. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2021) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Cialis Eli Lilly & Company, John George Hospital, Oakland Police Department, San Francisco Police Department, Anthony Somkin, Sutter Health, Walgreens Co.. Filed byChristian Gremmels. Consent/Declination due by 7/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2021) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAN FRANCISCO POLICE DEPARTMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where OAKLAND POLICE DEPARTMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where SUTTER HEALTH is a litigant

Latest cases where Walgreen Co. is a litigant