This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2022 at 06:48:30 (UTC).

Gremillion et al v. Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Co

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Gremillion filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allstate Vehicle Property Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00185

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Steven Gremillion

Chandi Gremillion

Defendant

Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Co

Special Masters

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Sulphur, LA 70663

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Donald W McKnight

Attorney at Hoffoss Devall

517 W College St

Lake Charles, LA 70605

Max Emile Guthrie

Attorney at Hoffoss Devall

517 W College St

Lake Charles, LA 70605

Douglas Cooper Fournet

Attorney at Hoffoss Devall

517 W College St

Lake Charles, LA 70605

Claude Pierson Devall

Attorney at Hoffoss Devall

517 W College St

Lake Charles, LA 70605

Defendant Attorney

Zelda W Tucker

P O Box 4845

Shreveport, LA 71134-4845

Special Master Attorneys

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Attorney at Juneau David

P O Drawer 51268

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney at Law Office of Cade R Cole

1523 Cypress St

Sulphur, LA 70663

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Co (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4968247) filed by Steven Gremillion, Chandi Gremillion. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Douglas Cooper Fournet added to party Chandi Gremillion(pty:pla), Attorney Douglas Cooper Fournet added to party Steven Gremillion(pty:pla))(aty,Fournet, Douglas) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#2

(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

2 #1

Exhibit A

2 #2

Exhibit B

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Co. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Gremillion, Chandi Gremillion. Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Co served on 1/27/2022, answer due 2/17/2022. (aty,Fournet, Douglas) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Co.(Attorney Zelda W Tucker added to party Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Tucker, Zelda) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Co naming Allstate Corp as corporate parent. (aty,Tucker, Zelda) Modified on 2/16/2022 to add corporate parent (Jones, P). (Entered: 02/15/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Co naming Allstate Corp as corporate parent. (aty,Tucker, Zelda) Modified on 2/16/2022 to add corporate parent (Jones, P). (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Co.(Attorney Zelda W Tucker added to party Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Tucker, Zelda) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Gremillion, Chandi Gremillion. Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Co served on 1/27/2022, answer due 2/17/2022. (aty,Fournet, Douglas) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Co. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Co (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4968247) filed by Steven Gremillion, Chandi Gremillion. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Douglas Cooper Fournet added to party Chandi Gremillion(pty:pla), Attorney Douglas Cooper Fournet added to party Steven Gremillion(pty:pla))(aty,Fournet, Douglas) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company is a litigant