This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/20/2022 at 07:11:14 (UTC).

Gregory v. Boston Scientific Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 04/21/2022 Gregory filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Boston Scientific Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William F. Kuntz, II and Vera M. Scanlon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02267

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William F. Kuntz, II

Referral Judge

Vera M. Scanlon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Samuel Gregory

Defendants

Boston Scientific Corporation

American Medical Systems, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dwayne Crispell

75 Prospect Park Sw

Brooklyn, NY 11215

Dwayne Crispell, Jr

1579 Sterling Pl, Ste Lc4

Brooklyn, NY 11213

Defendant Attorneys

Lisa Ann Herbert

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP

280 Park Ave., 15Th Floor W

New York, NY 10017

Christopher W. Fowlkes

9906 Kiwi Ave. N.

Brooklyn Park, MN 55443

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Certificate of Service

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Boston Scientific Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Boston Scientific Corporation for Boston Scientific Corporation. (Herbert, Lisa) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#5

(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephonic Initial Conference is scheduled for 8/25/2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. The parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. The parties must complete the attached Joint Proposed Case Management Plan (CMP) and file it on ECF no later than 8/9/2022. In the event that any Defendant(s) has not answered or otherwise appeared, Plaintiff(s) must also mail a copy of this Order, its attachment and the full docket to the last known mailing address(es) for such Defendant(s) and file proof on ECF by the CMP filing date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 4/22/2022. (Quinlan, Krista) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#6

(#6) Letter Pre-Motion Conference Letter by Boston Scientific Corporation (Herbert, Lisa) Modified on 4/28/2022 (Yu, Stephanie). (Entered: 04/27/2022)

#7

(#7) Letter Amended Pre-Motion Conference Letter by Boston Scientific Corporation (Herbert, Lisa) Modified on 4/28/2022 (Yu, Stephanie). (Entered: 04/27/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER: Because of the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic, the Court has suspended its pre-motion conference requirement. Therefore, the Court DENIES as moot Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation's ("Defendant") request for a pre-motion conference, ECF Nos. 6-7, and GRANTS Defendant leave to file the anticipated motion. The Court ORDERS the following briefing schedule: Defendant shall submit its motion by Friday, May 27, 2022 at 5:00 P.M.; Plaintiff shall submit its response by Monday, June 27, 2022 at 5:00 P.M.; and Defendant shall submit its reply, if any, by Monday, July 18, 2022 at 5:00 P.M. As a courtesy, the Court requests the parties refrain from filing motion papers until the motion has been fully briefed. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 4/27/2022. (Yu, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

9 #9

Main Document

9 #1

Affidavit

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher W. Fowlkes on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation (notification declined or already on case) (Fowlkes, Christopher) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#11

(#11) Letter by Boston Scientific Corporation (Herbert, Lisa) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Letter by Boston Scientific Corporation (Herbert, Lisa) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher W. Fowlkes on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation (notification declined or already on case) (Fowlkes, Christopher) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 5/2/2022. (Kang, Isen) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher W. Fowlkes Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15523806. by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Fowlkes, Christopher) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: Because of the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic, the Court has suspended its pre-motion conference requirement. Therefore, the Court DENIES as moot Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation's ("Defendant") request for a pre-motion conference, ECF Nos. 6-7, and GRANTS Defendant leave to file the anticipated motion. The Court ORDERS the following briefing schedule: Defendant shall submit its motion by Friday, May 27, 2022 at 5:00 P.M.; Plaintiff shall submit its response by Monday, June 27, 2022 at 5:00 P.M.; and Defendant shall submit its reply, if any, by Monday, July 18, 2022 at 5:00 P.M. As a courtesy, the Court requests the parties refrain from filing motion papers until the motion has been fully briefed. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 4/27/2022. (Yu, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Letter Amended Pre-Motion Conference Letter by Boston Scientific Corporation (Herbert, Lisa) Modified on 4/28/2022 (Yu, Stephanie). (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter Pre-Motion Conference Letter by Boston Scientific Corporation (Herbert, Lisa) Modified on 4/28/2022 (Yu, Stephanie). (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephonic Initial Conference is scheduled for 8/25/2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. The parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. The parties must complete the attached Joint Proposed Case Management Plan (CMP) and file it on ECF no later than 8/9/2022. In the event that any Defendant(s) has not answered or otherwise appeared, Plaintiff(s) must also mail a copy of this Order, its attachment and the full docket to the last known mailing address(es) for such Defendant(s) and file proof on ECF by the CMP filing date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 4/22/2022. (Quinlan, Krista) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketThis case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Boston Scientific Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Boston Scientific Corporation for Boston Scientific Corporation. (Herbert, Lisa) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Boston Scientific Corporation from Kings County Supreme Court, case number 507350/2022. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-15493583) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service) (Herbert, Lisa) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Boston Scientific Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher W Fowlkes