This case was last updated from PACER on 03/09/2019 at 07:53:48 (UTC).

Gregory et al v. Zions Bancorporation

Case Summary

On 01/08/2019 Gregory filed a Finance - Banking lawsuit against Zions Bancorporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul M. Warner, Robert J. Shelby and Dustin B. Pead. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00015

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Banking

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Dustin B. Pead

Presiding Judges

Paul M. Warner

Robert J. Shelby

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wayne Baker

Mike Israel

Stephen Beverley

Chad Hansen

Amy Springer

E. Wayne Larson

Eri Haley

Larry Fisher

Karen Beverley

Donald Haley

Travis Gregory

Carvel Anderson

Dixie Sargent

Nicole Gregory

Heather Hansen

Craig Sargent

Tracy Woodbury

Kelly Springer

David Peterson

Defendant

Zions Bancorporation

96 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Samuel H. Adams

Attorney at ADAMS DAVIS PC

35 W Broadway Ste 203

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

Brian O. Marty

Attorney at SHINDLER ANDERSON GOPLERUD & WEESE

5015 Grand Ridge Dr Ste 100

West Des Moines, IA 50265

Alan Rosca

Attorney at GOLDMAN SCARLATO & PENNY

23250 Chagrin Blvd Ste 100

Beachwood, OH 4412-5416

J. Barton Goplerud

Attorney at SHINDLER ANDERSON GOPLERUD & WEESE PC

5015 Grand Ridge Dr Ste 100

West Des Moines, IA 50265

Defendant Attorneys

Vi T. Tran

Attorney at FOLEY & LARDNER LLP

1000 Louisiana Ste 2000

Houston, TX 77002-2099

Rachel M. Blise

Attorney at FOLEY & LARDNER (WI)

777 E Wisconsin Ave Ste 3200

Milwaukee, WI 53202-5306

Beth I. Z. Boland

Attorney at FOLEY & LARDNER LLP

111 Huntington Ave Ste 2500

Boston, MA 02199-7610

Geoffrey H. Bracken

Attorney at FOLEY & LARDNER LLP

1000 Louisiana Ste 2000

Houston, TX 77002-2099

Steven T. Waterman

Attorney at DORSEY & WHITNEY LLP

111 S Main St 21St Fl

Salt Lake City, UT 84111-2176

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) ORDER granting #30 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Vi T. Tran for Zions Bancorporation. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 3/5/19. (dla) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#32

(#32) ORDER granting #29 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rachel M. Blise for Zions Bancorporation. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 3/5/19. (dla) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

30 #3

Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice Vi Tran

30 #2

Exhibit B - ECF Registration Form Vi Tran

30 #1

Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Vi Tran

#30

(#30) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Vi Tran , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3217769, filed by Defendant Zions Bancorporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Vi Tran, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Registration Form Vi Tran, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice Vi Tran)(Waterman, Steven) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

29 #3

Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice Rachel Blise

29 #2

Exhibit B - ECF Registration Form Rachel Blise

#29

(#29) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rachel Blise , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3217714, filed by Defendant Zions Bancorporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Rachel Blise, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Registration Form Rachel Blise, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice Rachel Blise)(Waterman, Steven) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

2 #12

Exhibit Exhibit 11

2 #11

Exhibit Exhibit 10

2 #10

Exhibit Exhibit 9

2 #9

Exhibit Exhibit 8

2 #6

Exhibit Exhibit 5

2 #5

Exhibit Exhibit 4

2 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 1

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Plaintiffs Carvel Anderson, Wayne Baker, Karen Beverley, Stephen Beverley, Larry Fisher, Nicole Gregory, Travis Gregory, Donald Haley, Eri Haley, Chad Hansen, Heather Hansen, Mike Israel, Darla Ketcham, E. Wayne Larson, David Peterson, Craig Sargent, Dixie Sargent, Amy Springer, Kelly Springer, Tracy Woodbury is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) ORDER granting #30 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Vi T. Tran for Zions Bancorporation. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 3/5/19. (dla) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) ORDER granting #29 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rachel M. Blise for Zions Bancorporation. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 3/5/19. (dla) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) ORDER granting #28 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Geoffrey H. Bracken for Zions Bancorporation. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 3/5/19. (dla) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Vi Tran , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3217769, filed by Defendant Zions Bancorporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Vi Tran, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Registration Form Vi Tran, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice Vi Tran)(Waterman, Steven) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rachel Blise , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3217714, filed by Defendant Zions Bancorporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Rachel Blise, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Registration Form Rachel Blise, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice Rachel Blise)(Waterman, Steven) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Geoffrey Bracken , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3217642, filed by Defendant Zions Bancorporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice of Geoffery Bracken, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - ECF Registration Form Geoffery Bracken, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion For Pro Hac Vice of Geoffrey Bracken)(Waterman, Steven) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • (#27) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 3/1/2019. (mjm) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ORDER OF RECUSAL: Judge Dee Benson recused. Case reassigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 2/25/2019. (mas) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER OF RECUSAL: Judge Tena Campbell recused. Case reassigned to Judge Dee Benson for all further proceedings: case number is now 2:19cv00015 DB. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 2/21/19 (alt) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • (#24) All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Tena Campbell. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to the case. (las) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of J. Barton Goplerud for Carvel Anderson,J. Barton Goplerud for Wayne Baker,J. Barton Goplerud for Karen Beverley,J. Barton Goplerud for Stephen Beverley,J. Barton Goplerud for Larry Fisher,J. Barton Goplerud for Nicole Gregory,J. Barton Goplerud for Travis Gregory,J. Barton Goplerud for Donald Haley,J. Barton Goplerud for Eri Haley,J. Barton Goplerud for Chad Hansen,J. Barton Goplerud for Heather Hansen,J. Barton Goplerud for Mike Israel,J. Barton Goplerud for Darla Ketcham,J. Barton Goplerud for E. Wayne Larson,J. Barton Goplerud for David Peterson,J. Barton Goplerud for Craig Sargent,J. Barton Goplerud for Dixie Sargent,J. Barton Goplerud for Amy Springer,J. Barton Goplerud for Kelly Springer,J. Barton Goplerud for Tracy Woodbury. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 1/15/2019. (las) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) EXHIBITS filed by Carvel Anderson, Wayne Baker, Karen Beverley, Stephen Beverley, Larry Fisher, Nicole Gregory, Travis Gregory, Donald Haley, Eri Haley, Chad Hansen, Heather Hansen, Mike Israel, Darla Ketcham, E. Wayne Larson, David Peterson, Craig Sargent, Dixie Sargent, Amy Springer, Kelly Springer, Tracy Woodbury re #6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brian O. Marty , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3179682,. (Adams, Samuel) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelly Springer, Dixie Sargent, Carvel Anderson, Heather Hansen, Eri Haley, Karen Beverley, Travis Gregory, Tracy Woodbury, Larry Fisher, E. Wayne Larson, Mike Israel, David Peterson, Wayne Baker, Nicole Gregory, Craig Sargent, Stephen Beverley, Amy Springer, Chad Hansen, Darla Ketcham, Donald Haley as to All Defendants. (Adams, Samuel) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Zions Bancorporation. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brian O. Marty , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3179682, filed by Plaintiffs Carvel Anderson, Wayne Baker, Karen Beverley, Stephen Beverley, Larry Fisher, Nicole Gregory, Travis Gregory, Donald Haley, Eri Haley, Chad Hansen, Heather Hansen, Mike Israel, Darla Ketcham, E. Wayne Larson, David Peterson, Craig Sargent, Dixie Sargent, Amy Springer, Kelly Springer, Tracy Woodbury. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PHV Application, #2 Exhibit ECF Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Adams, Samuel) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of J. Barton Goplerud , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3179674, filed by Plaintiffs Carvel Anderson, Wayne Baker, Karen Beverley, Stephen Beverley, Larry Fisher, Nicole Gregory, Travis Gregory, Donald Haley, Eri Haley, Chad Hansen, Heather Hansen, Mike Israel, Darla Ketcham, E. Wayne Larson, David Peterson, Craig Sargent, Dixie Sargent, Amy Springer, Kelly Springer, Tracy Woodbury. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PHV Application, #2 Exhibit ECF Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Adams, Samuel) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney J. Barton Goplerud and Brian O. Marty, for Plaintiffs Carvel Anderson, Wayne Baker, Karen Beverley, Stephen Beverley, Larry Fisher, Nicole Gregory, Travis Gregory, Donald Haley, Eri Haley, Chad Hansen, Heather Hansen, Mike Israel, Darla Ketcham, E. Wayne Larson, David Peterson, Craig Sargent, Dixie Sargent, Amy Springer, Kelly Springer, Tracy Woodbury. (nl) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Alan L. Rosca, Mark Goldman and Paul Scarlato, for Plaintiffs Carvel Anderson, Wayne Baker, Karen Beverley, Stephen Beverley, Larry Fisher, Nicole Gregory, Travis Gregory, Donald Haley, Eri Haley, Chad Hansen, Heather Hansen, Mike Israel, Darla Ketcham, E. Wayne Larson, David Peterson, Craig Sargent, Dixie Sargent, Amy Springer, Kelly Springer, Tracy Woodbury. (nl) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3177400) filed by Kelly Springer, Dixie Sargent, Carvel Anderson, Heather Hansen, Eri Haley, Karen Beverley, Travis Gregory, Tracy Woodbury, Larry Fisher, E. Wayne Larson, Mike Israel, David Peterson, Wayne Baker, Nicole Gregory, Craig Sargent, Stephen Beverley, Amy Springer, Chad Hansen, Darla Ketcham, Donald Haley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Adams, Samuel) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Plaintiffs Carvel Anderson, Wayne Baker, Karen Beverley, Stephen Beverley, Larry Fisher, Nicole Gregory, Travis Gregory, Donald Haley, Eri Haley, Chad Hansen, Heather Hansen, Mike Israel, Darla Ketcham, E. Wayne Larson, David Peterson, Craig Sargent, Dixie Sargent, Amy Springer, Kelly Springer, Tracy Woodbury is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.