Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/19/2020 at 09:23:09 (UTC).

Gregory et al v. Medtronic Inc et al

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 Gregory filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Medtronic Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is L Scott Coogler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-01637

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

L Scott Coogler

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nancy Marie Gregory

Francis Lee Gregory

Defendants

Covidien LP

Covidien Sales Inc

Medtronic Inc

Medtronic USA Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Erica Kathleen Kemmer

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF ERICA KEMMER, LLC

P.O. Box 592

Moundville, AL 35474

Trenton Rogers Garmon

Attorney at Garmon & Associates, PLLC

2024 Third Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Amended Complaint using terminology "exceeding $75,000" for Cons

#7

(#7) NOTICE by Francis Lee Gregory, Nancy Marie Gregory re #6 Order,, (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint using terminology "exceeding $75,000" for Consideration)(Garmon, Trenton) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER The Court ORDERS the Plaintiffs to file a notice and explanation explaining their basis for asserting federal subject matter jurisdiction in this case. If their case relies on diversity jurisdiction and 28 U.S.C. 1332, they must explain how diversity jurisdiction exists. If their case relies on federal question jurisdiction and 28 U.S.C. 1331, they must explain how their claims present federal questions. The plaintiffs must file this notice and explanation by December 18, 2020. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 12/10/2020. (PSM) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#5

(#5) RESPONSE to re #4 Plaintiffs Response and Notice of Due Diligence filed by Francis Lee Gregory, Nancy Marie Gregory. (Garmon, Trenton) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER The Court ORDERS the plaintiffs, within fourteen (14) days of this Order'sentry, to further amend their complaint to properly allege the citizenship of allparties if such can in good faith be done. Failure to comply with this Order may result in this matter's dismissal. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 11/12/2020. (PSM) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

3 #1

Supplement

#3

(#3) RESPONSE to re #2 Response to Court's Order and in the Alternative Motion for Leave of Court to Amend filed by Nancy Marie Gregory. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Garmon, Trenton) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

#2

(#2) ORDER Plaintiffs have fourteen (14) days from this Order's entry to SHOW CAUSE why the Court should not dismiss this case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, in that Plaintiffs insufficiently pled the citizenship of both Plaintiffs and of some Defendants. Plaintiffs' response shall not exceed ten (10) double-spaced pages. The response must be in 14-point type. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 10/26/2020. (PSM) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Covidien LP, Covidien Sales Inc, Medtronic Inc, Medtronic USA Inc, filed by Nancy Marie Gregory, Francis Lee Gregory.(PSM) Modified on 10/20/2020 (PSM,). (Entered: 10/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by Francis Lee Gregory, Nancy Marie Gregory re #6 Order,, (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint using terminology "exceeding $75,000" for Consideration)(Garmon, Trenton) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER The Court ORDERS the Plaintiffs to file a notice and explanation explaining their basis for asserting federal subject matter jurisdiction in this case. If their case relies on diversity jurisdiction and 28 U.S.C. 1332, they must explain how diversity jurisdiction exists. If their case relies on federal question jurisdiction and 28 U.S.C. 1331, they must explain how their claims present federal questions. The plaintiffs must file this notice and explanation by December 18, 2020. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 12/10/2020. (PSM) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RESPONSE to re #4 Plaintiffs Response and Notice of Due Diligence filed by Francis Lee Gregory, Nancy Marie Gregory. (Garmon, Trenton) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER The Court ORDERS the plaintiffs, within fourteen (14) days of this Order'sentry, to further amend their complaint to properly allege the citizenship of allparties if such can in good faith be done. Failure to comply with this Order may result in this matter's dismissal. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 11/12/2020. (PSM) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RESPONSE to re #2 Response to Court's Order and in the Alternative Motion for Leave of Court to Amend filed by Nancy Marie Gregory. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Garmon, Trenton) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER Plaintiffs have fourteen (14) days from this Order's entry to SHOW CAUSE why the Court should not dismiss this case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, in that Plaintiffs insufficiently pled the citizenship of both Plaintiffs and of some Defendants. Plaintiffs' response shall not exceed ten (10) double-spaced pages. The response must be in 14-point type. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 10/26/2020. (PSM) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3697785(B4601109195). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Covidien LP, Covidien Sales Inc, Medtronic Inc, Medtronic USA Inc, filed by Nancy Marie Gregory, Francis Lee Gregory.(PSM) Modified on 10/20/2020 (PSM,).. (Garmon, Trenton) Modified on 10/21/2020 (MEB2). (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for service by certified mail filed by Francis Lee Gregory, Nancy Marie Gregory, as stated in complaint #1 . (PSM) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Covidien LP, Covidien Sales Inc, Medtronic Inc, Medtronic USA Inc, filed by Nancy Marie Gregory, Francis Lee Gregory.(PSM) Modified on 10/20/2020 (PSM,). (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Covidien Sales LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where COVIDIEN LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Medtronic, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Trenton Rogers Garmon