This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/26/2020 at 08:42:15 (UTC).

Gregor et al v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 03/27/2020 Gregor filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terence Kern and Frank H McCarthy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00128

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terence Kern

Referral Judge

Frank H McCarthy

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Debra Gregor

Dale A Gregor, Jr

Jonathon Thetford

Defendant

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Wayne Speed

Attorney at Braly Braly Speed & Morris PLLC

P O Box 2739

Ada, OK 74821-2739

Mark C. Burgess

Attorney at Burgess Law Firm, PLLC

4201 Texas Blvd

Texarkana, TX 75503-3012

George Webster Braly

Attorney at Braly Braly Speed & Morris PLLC

P O Box 2739

Ada, OK 74821-2739

Defendant Attorneys

Nolan Fields

Attorney at DOJ-USAO

110 W 7Th Street, Ste 300

Tulsa, OK 74119

Rachael Faye Zintgraff

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office (Tulsa)

110 W 7Th St Ste 300

Tulsa, OK 74119-1013

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Stay by United States of America (Fields, Nolan) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Nolan Fields on behalf of United States of America [Note: Attorney Nolan Fields added to party United States of America(pty:dft).] (Fields, Nolan) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Rachael Faye Zintgraff on behalf of United States of America [Note: Attorney Rachael Faye Zintgraff added to party United States of America(pty:dft).] (Zintgraff, Rachael) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: United States of America (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Debra Gregor, Jonathon Thetford, Dale A Gregor, Jr (Braly, George) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: United States of America (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Debra Gregor, Jonathon Thetford, Dale A Gregor, Jr (Braly, George) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to United States of America (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by William Wayne Speed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Speed, William) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by George Webster Braly on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Braly, George) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark C. Burgess on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Burgess, Mark) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against United States of America (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2190437) by Debra Gregor, Jonathon Thetford, Dale A Gregor, Jr (Braly, George) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Dale A Gregor, Jr, Debra Gregor, Jonathon Thetford (Braly, George) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer William W. Speed

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark C Burgess