This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/08/2022 at 07:37:41 (UTC).

GREER v. WALMART, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 01/07/2022 GREER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WALMART, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christine P. O'Hearn and Ann Marie Donio. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00082

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christine P. O'Hearn

Referral Judge

Ann Marie Donio

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARION GREER, JR.

Defendants

WALMART, INC.

JOHN/JANE DOES 1-10

ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PATRICK J REILLY, III

Attorney at CLARK & FOX

951 Haddonfield Road, Suite A-2B

Cherry Hill, NJ 08002

Defendant Attorneys

CHRISTINA MARIE MATTEO

Attorney at MCDONNELL & ASSOCIATES

860 First Avenue, Suite 5B

King Of Prussia, PA 19406

PATRICK J. MCDONNELL

Attorney at MCDONNELL & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

860 First Avenue, Suite 5B

King Of Prussia, PA 19406

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by WALMART, INC.. (MATTEO, CHRISTINA) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#13

(#13) ORDER TO REMOVE CASE FROM THE ARBITRATION PROGRAM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 2/8/2022. (alb) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER:Telephone Status Conference set for 6/1/2022 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Amended Pleadings due by 4/29/2022. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 9/30/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 2/28/2023 etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 2/8/2022. (alb) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#11

(#11) Certification on behalf of WALMART, INC.. (MATTEO, CHRISTINA) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#10

(#10) Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/27/2021. (alb) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#9

(#9) Letter. (MATTEO, CHRISTINA) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#8

(#8) Joint Discovery Plan by WALMART, INC..(MATTEO, CHRISTINA) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK J. MCDONNELL on behalf of WALMART, INC. (MCDONNELL, PATRICK) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#4

(#4) AMENDED Order Initial Conference set for 2/8/2022 10:00 AM in Camden - Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/10/2021. (alb) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#3

(#3) Order Initial Conference set for 2/10/2022 10:00 AM in Camden - Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/7/2021. (alb) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WALMART, INC.. (MATTEO, CHRISTINA) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by WALMART, INC.. (MATTEO, CHRISTINA) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER TO REMOVE CASE FROM THE ARBITRATION PROGRAM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 2/8/2022. (alb) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER:Telephone Status Conference set for 6/1/2022 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Amended Pleadings due by 4/29/2022. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 9/30/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 2/28/2023 etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 2/8/2022. (alb) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Initial Scheduling Conference held via telephone on 2/8/2022. (sb, ) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Certification on behalf of WALMART, INC.. (MATTEO, CHRISTINA) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/27/2021. (alb) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Letter. (MATTEO, CHRISTINA) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint Discovery Plan by WALMART, INC..(MATTEO, CHRISTINA) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference on 2/8/2022 at 10:00 A.M. shall be held VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference: 1-888-684-8852 / 2828702# / 654321#. Additionally, the joint discovery plan shall either be filed on the docket, or alternatively, emailed to njdnef_donio@njd.uscourts.gov. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/24/2022. (slc) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ORDER: Order in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties, #click here, within 30 days of the filing of a Notice of Removal, or where the Complaint is initially filed in this Court, 30 days after an answer, other responsive pleading, or motion has been filed. So Ordered by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 1/12/2022. (db, ) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK J. MCDONNELL on behalf of WALMART, INC. (MCDONNELL, PATRICK) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED Order Initial Conference set for 2/8/2022 10:00 AM in Camden - Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/10/2021. (alb) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Initial Conference set for 2/10/2022 10:00 AM in Camden - Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/7/2021. (alb) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The COMPLAINT submitted by PATRICK J. REILLY appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (alb) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (alb) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketJudge Christine P. O'Hearn and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dmw) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WALMART, INC.. (MATTEO, CHRISTINA) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WALMART, INC. from Superior Court of Camden County, NJ, case number CAM-L-002535-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13092939), filed by WALMART, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(MATTEO, CHRISTINA) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHRISTINA MATTEO

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PATRICK J. MCDONNELL