Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:24:11 (UTC).

Greer v. Elliott et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Greer filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Elliott. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy Percy and Neal B. Biggers. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00260

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Roy Percy

Presiding Judge

Neal B. Biggers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Julia Greer

Defendants

Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.

Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Endo International PLC

Purdue Pharma L.P.

Primary Care Clinic of Ripley, P.A.

Marshall Hollis

Endo Health Solutions Inc.

John Does 1-10

Hollis Discount Pharmacy, Inc.

The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.

Purdue Pharma Inc.

Charles Elliott, M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jefferson Vaughan Hester

Attorney at GREER RUSSELL DENT & LEATHERS, PLLC

P.O. Box 907

Tupelo, MS 38802

Defendant Attorneys

David Friederich Maron

Attorney at BAKER, DONELSON, BEARMAN CALDWELL & BERKOWITZ

P.O. Box 14167

Jackson, MS 39236

Samuel Deucalion Gregory

Attorney at BAKER DONELSON BEARMAN CALDWELL & BERKOWITZ

P.O. Box 14167, 100 Vision Drive, Suite 400

Jackson, MS 39211

R. David Kaufman

Attorney at BRUNINI, GRANTHAM, GROWER & HEWES

P. O. Drawer 119

Jackson, MS 39205-0119

Leo Joseph Carmody, Jr.

Attorney at UPCHURCH & UPCHURCH, P.A.

2692 West Oxford Loop #104

Oxford, MS 38655

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case Transferred to Northern District of Ohio. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. CASE CLOSED. (jtm)

#14

(#14) AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint - State Court by Primary Care Clinic of Ripley, P.A.; filed in State Court. (jla) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#13

(#13) AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint - State Court by Charles Elliott, MD; filed in State Court. (jla) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by Primary Care Clinic of Ripley, P.A.; filed in State Court. (jla) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by Charles Elliott, MD; filed in State Court. (jla) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

10 #24

Exhibit X - Order Appointing Special Judge

10 #23

Exhibit W - Order of Recusal

10 #20

Exhibit T - Summons to Hollis Discount Pharmacy, Inc.

10 #19

Exhibit S - Summons to Marshall Hollis.

10 #18

Exhibit R - Summons to Charles Elliott, M.D.

10 #17

Exhibit Q - Summons toPrimary Care Clinic of Ripley, P.A.

10 #16

Exhibit P - Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss

10 #15

Exhibit O - Summons to Purdue Pharma, L.P.

10 #14

Exhibit N - Summons to Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

10 #13

Exhibit M - Summons to EndoHealth Solution, Inc.

10 #12

Exhibit L - Summons to Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.

10 #11

Exhibit K - Summons to Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.

#2

(#2) STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Julia Greer. (jla)

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • Remark: Case transferred from Mississippi Northern has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:19-op-46117, filed 12/09/2019. (jtm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case Transferred to Northern District of Ohio. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. CASE CLOSED. (jtm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint - State Court by Primary Care Clinic of Ripley, P.A.; filed in State Court. (jla) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint - State Court by Charles Elliott, MD; filed in State Court. (jla) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by Primary Care Clinic of Ripley, P.A.; filed in State Court. (jla) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by Charles Elliott, MD; filed in State Court. (jla) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit C - Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Appearance of David Upchurch, Leo Carmody and John McIntosh, #5 Exhibit E - Answer and Defenses of Charles Elliott, #6 Exhibit F - Answer and Defenses of Primary Care Clinic of Ripley, #7 Exhibit G - Motion to Dismiss by Charles Elliott, #8 Exhibit H - Defendants Undisputed Facts in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #9 Exhibit I - Summons to Purdue Pharma, Inc., #10 Exhibit J - Summons to Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., #11 Exhibit K - Summons to Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., #12 Exhibit L - Summons to Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., #13 Exhibit M - Summons to EndoHealth Solution, Inc., #14 Exhibit N - Summons to Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #15 Exhibit O - Summons to Purdue Pharma, L.P., #16 Exhibit P - Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss, #17 Exhibit Q - Summons toPrimary Care Clinic of Ripley, P.A., #18 Exhibit R - Summons to Charles Elliott, M.D., #19 Exhibit S - Summons to Marshall Hollis., #20 Exhibit T - Summons to Hollis Discount Pharmacy, Inc., #21 Exhibit U - Amended Answer and Defenses of Charles Elliott, #22 Exhibit V - Amended Answer and Defenses of Primary Care Clinic of Ripley, #23 Exhibit W - Order of Recusal, #24 Exhibit X - Order Appointing Special Judge, #25 Exhibit Y - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal) (Gregory, Samuel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE by R. David Kaufman on behalf of Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. of Suggestion of Bankruptcy and Automatic Stay of Proceedings and Notice of Preliminary Injunction Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Purdue's Bankruptcy Petition, #2 Exhibit B - 2nd Amended Order Granting Preliminary Injunction) (Kaufman, R.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/25/19. (bnd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Leo Joseph Carmody, Jr on behalf of Charles Elliott, MD, Primary Care Clinic of Ripley, P.A. (Carmody, Leo)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Maron, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #3 Corporate Statement; Please refile to include electronic signature of Samuel Gregory (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint - State Court, #1 Notice of Removal,,, Unopposed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Maron, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 1/6/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/19/19. (rtc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Gregory, Samuel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Biggers and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Julia Greer. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc. from Tippah County Circuit Court, case number CV2019-106. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1740558) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Par Pharmaceutical Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where Endo International Plc is a litigant

Latest cases where Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc is a litigant