Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/26/2020 at 07:20:39 (UTC).

Greer-Storment et al v. Traveler's Indemnity Company, Inc

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 Greer-Storment filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Traveler's Indemnity Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark A. Beatty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01309

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark A. Beatty

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Paul M. Storment, Jr.

Belleville, IL 62220

Joann Greer-Storment

Defendants

The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company

Travelers Indemnity Company, Inc.

Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul M. Storment, Jr.

Attorney at Law Offices of Paul M. Storment, Jr.

310 East Washington

Belleville, IL 62220

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew S. Ponzi

Attorney at Foran, Glennon et al.

222 North Lasalle Street, Suite 1400

Chicago, IL 60601

Thomas B. Orlando

Attorney at Foran Glennon, et al - Chicago

222 North Lasalle Street, Suite 1400

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE to Paul Storment STRIKING PLEADING: : The Clerks Office received your Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form. The form is incomplete and the incorrect filing event was used. It fails to list each party that is consenting or not consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction ("et al" is insufficient). Therefore, the pleading is STRICKEN. Another form is attached to this Notice. The form should be re-filed as soon as possible using the event Civil>Other Documents>Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge. The form should specifically list each party that is consenting or not consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction. Please note that, pursuant to the Courts prior Order, the deadline for submitting this form is 2/6/2020. (tba) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, this case is reassigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. District Judge J. Phil Gilbert no longer assigned to the case. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Joann Greer-Storment, Paul M. Storment, Jr., Travelers Indemnity Company, Inc., and Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 19-1309-MAB. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 2/6/2020. (trb). (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#9

(#9) REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by All Plaintiffs. (Storment, Paul) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#8

(#8) RESPONSE to #6 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Orlando, Thomas) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#6

(#6) First MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 1/13/2020 (Storment, Paul) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas B. Orlando $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4050107 by on behalf of The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Orlando, Thomas) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Ponzi, Matthew) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

3 #1

Consent Brochure

#3

(#3) Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-1309-JPG-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(kek) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S. Ponzi on behalf of The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company (Ponzi, Matthew) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Clair County, Illinois, case number 19-AR-0813 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4040993), filed by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ponzi, Matthew) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE to Paul Storment STRIKING PLEADING: : The Clerks Office received your Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form. The form is incomplete and the incorrect filing event was used. It fails to list each party that is consenting or not consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction ("et al" is insufficient). Therefore, the pleading is STRICKEN. Another form is attached to this Notice. The form should be re-filed as soon as possible using the event Civil>Other Documents>Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge. The form should specifically list each party that is consenting or not consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction. Please note that, pursuant to the Courts prior Order, the deadline for submitting this form is 2/6/2020. (tba) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, this case is reassigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. District Judge J. Phil Gilbert no longer assigned to the case. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Joann Greer-Storment, Paul M. Storment, Jr., Travelers Indemnity Company, Inc., and Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 19-1309-MAB. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 2/6/2020. (trb). (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by All Plaintiffs. (Storment, Paul) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE to #6 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Orlando, Thomas) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Thomas B. Orlando on behalf of Defendant The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) First MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 1/13/2020 (Storment, Paul) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas B. Orlando $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4050107 by on behalf of The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Orlando, Thomas) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Ponzi, Matthew) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-1309-JPG-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(kek) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S. Ponzi on behalf of The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company (Ponzi, Matthew) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Clair County, Illinois, case number 19-AR-0813 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4040993), filed by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ponzi, Matthew) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Charter Oak Fire Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases where Travelers Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas Berthold Orlando

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew S Ponzi