This case was last updated from PACER on 08/02/2019 at 07:31:27 (UTC).

Elizabeth L. Greenwood v. City of Los Angeles et al

Case Summary

On 06/03/2019 Elizabeth L Greenwood filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against City of Los Angeles. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alka Sagar and Dale S. Fischer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-04823

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alka Sagar

Presiding Judge

Dale S. Fischer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Elizabeth L Greenwood

Elizabeth L. Greenwood

Defendants

Cory Brente

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Michael N Feuer

Los Angeles, CA 90071

City of Los Angeles

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Does 1 through 20, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gayle Lenore Eskridge

Attorney at Eskridge Law

21250 Hawthorne Boulevard Suite 450

Torrance, CA 90503-5512

Jacqueline Marie Wade

Attorney at Eskridge Law

21250 Hawthrone Boulevard Suite 450

Torrance, CA 90503-5512

Janelle Lynn Menges

Attorney at Eskridge Law

21250 Hawthorne Boulevard Suite 450

Torrance, CA 90503-5512

Defendant Attorneys

Marvin Chan Cho

Attorney at Burke Williams and Sorensen LLP

444 S. Flower Street, Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2953

Susan E Coleman

Attorney at Burke Williams and Sorensen LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2953

Paloma P Peracchio

Attorney at Burke Williams and Sorensen LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#1

CONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT against Defendants Cory Brente, City of Los Angeles, Does 1 through 20, inclusive, Michael N Feuer amending Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by plaintiff Elizabeth L. Greenwood. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/21/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A PAGE 4)(ghap) Modified on 6/4/2019 (ghap). (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Cory Brente, City of Los Angeles, Michael N Feuer. (Cho, Marvin) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#3

(#3) DECLARATION of Marvin C. Cho re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Cory Brente, City of Los Angeles, Michael N Feuer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - part 1, #2 Exhibit A - part 2, #3 Exhibit B - part 1, #4 Exhibit B - part 2, #5 Exhibit C - part 1, #6 Exhibit C - part 2, #7 Exhibit C - part 3, #8 Certificate of Service)(Cho, Marvin) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

3 #8

Certificate of Service

3 #6

Exhibit C - part 2

3 #7

Exhibit C - part 3

3 #2

Exhibit A - part 2

3 #3

Exhibit B - part 1

3 #4

Exhibit B - part 2

#16

(#16) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Courtt. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court - Central District. Case number: 19STCV02469. (jp) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

10 #4

Proposed Order

10 #1

Exhibit A

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND FIRST AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT AND TO REMAND ACTION TO STATE COURT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF JANELLE L. MENGES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by plaintiff Elizabeth L. Greenwood. Motion set for hearing on 7/22/2019 at 01:00 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order) (Eskridge, Gayle) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#15

(#15) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING MOTION for Leave to Amend and GRANTING Motion to Remand #10 . The Case is REMANDED to the Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated). (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

10 #2

Exhibit B

10 #3

Exhibit C

#14

(#14) REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND FIRST AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT AND TO REMAND ACTION TO STATE COURT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF JANELLE L. MENGES IN SUPPORT THEREOF #10 filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth L. Greenwood. (Eskridge, Gayle) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#13

(#13) Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND FIRST AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT AND TO REMAND ACTION TO STATE COURT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF JANELLE L. MENGES IN SUPPORT THEREOF #10 filed by Defendants Cory Brente, City of Los Angeles, Michael N Feuer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - part 1, #3 Exhibit B - part 2)(Cho, Marvin) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Courtt. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court - Central District. Case number: 19STCV02469. (jp) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING MOTION for Leave to Amend and GRANTING Motion to Remand #10 . The Case is REMANDED to the Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated). (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND FIRST AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT AND TO REMAND ACTION TO STATE COURT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF JANELLE L. MENGES IN SUPPORT THEREOF #10 filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth L. Greenwood. (Eskridge, Gayle) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND FIRST AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT AND TO REMAND ACTION TO STATE COURT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF JANELLE L. MENGES IN SUPPORT THEREOF #10 filed by Defendants Cory Brente, City of Los Angeles, Michael N Feuer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - part 1, #3 Exhibit B - part 2)(Cho, Marvin) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Joint Stipulation to Allow Defendants an Extension of Time to File Initial Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #11 is due 8/7/2019. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 7, 2019 re Amended Complaint, filed by defendants Cory Brente, City of Los Angeles, Michael N Feuer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Peracchio, Paloma) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND FIRST AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT AND TO REMAND ACTION TO STATE COURT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF JANELLE L. MENGES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by plaintiff Elizabeth L. Greenwood. Motion set for hearing on 7/22/2019 at 01:00 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order) (Eskridge, Gayle) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Joint Stipulation to Allow Defendants an Extension of Time to File Initial Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #8 . (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to City of Los Angeles answer now due 7/8/2019; Cory Brente answer now due 7/8/2019; Michael N Feuer answer now due 7/8/2019, re Amended Complaint, filed by defendants City of Los Angeles; Cory Brente; Michael N Feuer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Peracchio, Paloma) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2019
  • CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Elizabeth L. Greenwood, upon Defendant Michael N Feuer served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michael Valdivia Deputy Clerk (Authorized to Accept) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/11/209 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT C-13 PAGE 781) (ghap) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Elizabeth L. Greenwood, upon Defendant Office of The Los Angeles City Attorney Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michael Valdivia Deputy Clerk (Authorized to Accept) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/11/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT C-12 PAGE 778) (ghap) Modified on 6/4/2019 (ghap). (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Elizabeth L. Greenwood, upon Defendant City of Los Angeles served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Caroline Peters Deputy Clerk (Authorized to Accept) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/11/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT C-11 PAGE 775) (ghap) Modified on 6/4/2019 (ghap). (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Cory Brente, City of Los Angeles, Michael N Feuer. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/4/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT C-3 PAGE 443)(ghap) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Cory Brente, City of Los Angeles, Does 1 through 20, inclusive, Michael N Feuer. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Elizabeth L. Greenwood. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/25/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B 282) (ghap) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT against Defendants Cory Brente, City of Los Angeles, Does 1 through 20, inclusive, Michael N Feuer amending Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by plaintiff Elizabeth L. Greenwood. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/21/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A PAGE 4)(ghap) Modified on 6/4/2019 (ghap). (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Cory Brente, City of Los Angeles, Michael N Feuer, (Cho, Marvin) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DECLARATION of Marvin C. Cho re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Cory Brente, City of Los Angeles, Michael N Feuer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - part 1, #2 Exhibit A - part 2, #3 Exhibit B - part 1, #4 Exhibit B - part 2, #5 Exhibit C - part 1, #6 Exhibit C - part 2, #7 Exhibit C - part 3, #8 Certificate of Service)(Cho, Marvin) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Cory Brente, City of Los Angeles, Michael N Feuer. (Cho, Marvin) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Calfornia, County of Los Angeles, case number 19STCV02469 Receipt No: 0973-23848620 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Cory Brente, Michael N Feuer. (Attorney Marvin Chan Cho added to party Cory Brente(pty:dft), Attorney Marvin Chan Cho added to party City of Los Angeles(pty:dft), Attorney Marvin Chan Cho added to party Michael N Feuer(pty:dft))(Cho, Marvin) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.