This case was last updated from PACER on 02/14/2020 at 07:53:31 (UTC).

GREENWOOD v. BOLSTER

Case Summary

On 12/16/2019 GREENWOOD filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against BOLSTER. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Tanya S. Chutkan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03768

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tanya S. Chutkan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

TERRENCE O. GREENWOOD

Petersburg, VA 23804-1000

Defendant and Respondent

MARK J. BOLSTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Timothy Ronald Cahill

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEYS OFFICE FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

555 4Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by MARK J. BOLSTER. (Cahill, Timothy) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#8

(#8) SHOW CAUSE Executed as to United States Attorney pursuant to Order to Show Cause #2 ; Date of Service of show cause order 1/22/20. (ztd) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Ronald Cahill on behalf of MARK J. BOLSTER (Cahill, Timothy) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#7

(#7) SHOW CAUSE Executed as to MARK J. BOLSTER pursuant to Order to Show Cause #2 ; Date of Service of show cause order 1/16/20. (ztd) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER: Advising pro se Plaintiff of his obligation to follow the FRCP, Local Rules and orders of the court. Failure to adhere to these rules or orders may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order: The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order to TERRENCE O. GREENWOOD, No. 11018-007, PETERSBURG LOW FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, Inmate Mail/Parcels, P.O. BOX 1000, PETERSBURG, VA 23804-1000. (See order for further details) Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/17/2020. (DJS) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#4

(#4) SHOW CAUSE Executed as to U.S. Attorney General pursuant to Order to Show Cause Date of Service of show cause order 1/14/2020. (eg) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#3

(#3) SHOW CAUSE (3) Issued as to MARK J. BOLSTER, U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney pursuant to Order to Show Cause #2 (adh, ) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#2

(#2) ORDER directing Respondent to show cause within 20 days of service process why Writ of Habeas should not issue. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/2/20. (ms) Modified on 1/4/2020 (DJS). (Entered: 01/02/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit 1-4

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 4616010853.) filed by TERRENCE O. GREENWOOD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-4)(ztd) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by MARK J. BOLSTER. (Cahill, Timothy) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SHOW CAUSE Executed as to United States Attorney pursuant to Order to Show Cause #2 ; Date of Service of show cause order 1/22/20. (ztd) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Ronald Cahill on behalf of MARK J. BOLSTER (Cahill, Timothy) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SHOW CAUSE Executed as to MARK J. BOLSTER pursuant to Order to Show Cause #2 ; Date of Service of show cause order 1/16/20. (ztd) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Advising pro se Plaintiff of his obligation to follow the FRCP, Local Rules and orders of the court. Failure to adhere to these rules or orders may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order: The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order to TERRENCE O. GREENWOOD, No. 11018-007, PETERSBURG LOW FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, Inmate Mail/Parcels, P.O. BOX 1000, PETERSBURG, VA 23804-1000. (See order for further details) Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/17/2020. (DJS) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SHOW CAUSE Executed as to U.S. Attorney General pursuant to Order to Show Cause Date of Service of show cause order 1/14/2020. (eg) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SHOW CAUSE (3) Issued as to MARK J. BOLSTER, U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney pursuant to Order to Show Cause #2 (adh, ) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER directing Respondent to show cause within 20 days of service process why Writ of Habeas should not issue. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/2/20. (ms) Modified on 1/4/2020 (DJS). (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 4616010853.) filed by TERRENCE O. GREENWOOD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-4)(ztd) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less