This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/20/2022 at 07:45:31 (UTC).

Greenwood et al v. Cando Rail & Terminals, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/21/2022 Greenwood filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Cando Rail Terminals, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan O. Hickey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01024

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan O. Hickey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Marci Greenwood

Kourtney Greenwood

Defendants

Cando Rail & Terminals, Inc.

Cando Rail Services, LTD

Georgia-Pacific Consumer Operations, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Melody H. Piazza

Attorney at Trammell Piazza Law Firm, P.L.L.C.

1501 North University Avenue, Suite 350

Little Rock, AR 72207

Nathan L Karlin

Attorney at Pottroff & Karlin LLC

320 Sunset Ave.

Manhattan, KS 66502

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher D. Meyer

Attorney at Burr & Forman LLP

190 E. Capitol Street, Suite M-100

Jackson, MS 39201

Thomas H. Davis

Attorney at Stinson Morrison Hecker LLP

1201 Walnut Street, Suite 2900

Kansas City, MO 64106

Matthew J. Shepherd

Attorney at Matthew J. Shepherd, P.A.

200 N. Jefferson Ave., Suite 600

El Dorado, AR 71730-5615

Courtney Harrison

Attorney at Stinson LLP

1201 Walnut, Suite 2900

Kansas City, MO 64106

Thomas Heywood Davis

Attorney at Stinson LLP

1201 Walnut Street, Ste 2900

Kansas City, MO 64106

 

Court Documents

#31

(#31) STATEMENT OF FACTS in support of #30 Response to Motion by Kourtney Greenwood, Marci Greenwood. (Karlin, Nathan) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

#30

(#30) RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kourtney Greenwood, Marci Greenwood. (Karlin, Nathan) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

#29

(#29) SUPPLEMENT by Defendant Georgia-Pacific Consumer Operations, LLC to #20 Response to Motion . (Harrison, Courtney) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#28

(#28) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be conducted by 7/13/2022. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 7/20/2022. Jury Trial set for the week of 6/5/2023 in El Dorado -- 2nd flr before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 15, 2022. (rwg) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

23 #1

Exh. 1 - Proposed Supplemental Brief

23 #23

Main Document

#21

(#22) STATEMENT OF FACTS in support of #21 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Cando Rail & Terminals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Declaration of R. Soenen, #2 Exhibit Ex. A-1 - Payroll Information, #3 Exhibit Ex. A-2 - Ledger of WC Payments, #4 Exhibit Ex. B - Affidavit of Q. Woods, #5 Exhibit Ex B-1 - WC First Report of Injury, #6 Exhibit Ex. B-2 - WC Employer's Acceptance Form, #7 Exhibit Ex. B-3 - WC Funeral Expenses, #8 Exhibit Ex. B-4 - Amerisure Ledger, #9 Exhibit Ex. C - Offer Letter to Greenwood, #10 Exhibit Ex. D - Local Operating Instructions, #11 Exhibit Ex. E - Map of Cando Operations at GP Crossett Facility)(Meyer, Christopher) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

20 #1

Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Tommy Smith

20 #20

Main Document

16 #9

Exhibit 9 - Cando 206 promo book

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Georgia-Pacific Consumer Operations, LLC. (Shepherd, Matthew) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Georgia-Pacific Consumer Operations, LLC.(Shepherd, Matthew) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE by Cando Rail & Terminals, Inc. re #2 Notice of Removal (Joinder) (Meyer, Christopher) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#5

(#5) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (cnn) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Cando Rail & Terminals, Inc. (originally filed in state court)(cnn) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#3

(#7) ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Georgia-Pacific Consumer Operations, LLC.(Shepherd, Matthew) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#2

(#6) NOTICE by Cando Rail & Terminals, Inc. re #2 Notice of Removal (Joinder) (Meyer, Christopher) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Georgia-Pacific Consumer Operations, LLC. (cnn) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) STATEMENT OF FACTS in support of #30 Response to Motion by Kourtney Greenwood, Marci Greenwood. (Karlin, Nathan) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kourtney Greenwood, Marci Greenwood. (Karlin, Nathan) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) SUPPLEMENT by Defendant Georgia-Pacific Consumer Operations, LLC to #20 Response to Motion . (Harrison, Courtney) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be conducted by 7/13/2022. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 7/20/2022. Jury Trial set for the week of 6/5/2023 in El Dorado -- 2nd flr before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 15, 2022. (rwg) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #23 Motion to Supplement Response. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 15, 2022. (cha) Modified on 6/16/2022 to add text (cnn). (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Remand filed by Kourtney Greenwood, Marci Greenwood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Hoots Order & Transcript)(Karlin, Nathan) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 13, 2022. (cha) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION Leave to File Reply in Support of Remand re #16 MOTION to Remand by Kourtney Greenwood, Marci Greenwood. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Remand, #2 Exhibit 1 - Hoots Order and Transcript)(Karlin, Nathan) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION to Supplement #20 Response to Motion by Georgia-Pacific Consumer Operations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exh. 1 - Proposed Supplemental Brief)(Harrison, Courtney) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) STATEMENT OF FACTS in support of #21 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Cando Rail & Terminals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Declaration of R. Soenen, #2 Exhibit Ex. A-1 - Payroll Information, #3 Exhibit Ex. A-2 - Ledger of WC Payments, #4 Exhibit Ex. B - Affidavit of Q. Woods, #5 Exhibit Ex B-1 - WC First Report of Injury, #6 Exhibit Ex. B-2 - WC Employer's Acceptance Form, #7 Exhibit Ex. B-3 - WC Funeral Expenses, #8 Exhibit Ex. B-4 - Amerisure Ledger, #9 Exhibit Ex. C - Offer Letter to Greenwood, #10 Exhibit Ex. D - Local Operating Instructions, #11 Exhibit Ex. E - Map of Cando Operations at GP Crossett Facility)(Meyer, Christopher) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Georgia-Pacific Consumer Operations, LLC. (Shepherd, Matthew) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Georgia-Pacific Consumer Operations, LLC.(Shepherd, Matthew) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Cando Rail & Terminals, Inc. re #2 Notice of Removal (Joinder) (Meyer, Christopher) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Defendant Georgia-Pacific Consumer Operations, LLC. Notice of Removal #2 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Courtney J. Harrison. (cnn) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal. Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 4/25/2022 (cnn) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (cnn) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Cando Rail & Terminals, Inc. (originally filed in state court)(cnn) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against Cando Rail & Terminals, Inc., Georgia-Pacific Consumer Operations, LLC, filed by Marci Greenwood, Kourtney Greenwood. (originally filed in state court)(cnn) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ashley County Circuit, case number CV 22-36-3., filed by Georgia-Pacific Consumer Operations, LLC.(cnn) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Georgia-Pacific Consumer Operations, LLC. (cnn) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEORGIA PACIFIC LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathan L Karlin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melody H. Piazza