This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/24/2023 at 07:20:28 (UTC).

Greenwich Insurance Company v. Empire Oil & Gas, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/23/2023 Greenwich Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Empire Oil Gas, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas S Kleeh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00009

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas S Kleeh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Greenwich Insurance Company

Defendants

P. D. Farr

Empire Oil & Gas, Inc.

Scott A. Windom

William A. Farr

Pete

John C. Farr

Lee Ann Farr

Barbara Wright Sigley

Amy R. Zannino

National American Insurance Company

American Safety Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ezra S. Gollogly

Lee Murray Hall

Joseph Dudek

Taylor B. Scott

Defendant Attorney

Tiffany R. Durst

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 1 - Harrison Co. Cir. Court Case #20-C-163-1

1 #3

Exhibit 2 - First Amended Complaint in 20-C-163-1

#3

(#3) VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION re #1 Complaint. (mail Gollogly, Dudek and Scott) (cnd) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to National American Insurance Company. SOS accepted service on 2/7/2023. (jss) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to American Safety Casualty Insurance Company. SOS accepted service on 2/7/2023. (jss) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Empire Oil & Gas, Inc. SOS accepted service on 2/7/2023. (jss) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Amy R. Zannino served on 2/20/2023. (Hall, Lee) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Scott A. Windom served on 2/20/2023. (Hall, Lee) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Greenwich Insurance Company. (Hall, Lee) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany R. Durst on behalf of American Safety Casualty Insurance Company, National American Insurance Company (Durst, Tiffany) (Entered: 03/14/2023)

#12

(#12) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Greenwich Insurance Company. (Hall, Lee) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Greenwich Insurance Company. (Hall, Lee) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

14 #14

Main Document

14 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 4/24/2023. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/8/2023. Discovery due by 5/24/2023. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 3/23/2023. (snc) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by American Safety Casualty Insurance Company, National American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Durst, Tiffany) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Greenwich Insurance Company. (Hall, Lee) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Greenwich Insurance Company. (Hall, Lee) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany R. Durst on behalf of American Safety Casualty Insurance Company, National American Insurance Company (Durst, Tiffany) (Entered: 03/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Greenwich Insurance Company. (Hall, Lee) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Scott A. Windom served on 2/20/2023. (Hall, Lee) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Amy R. Zannino served on 2/20/2023. (Hall, Lee) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Empire Oil & Gas, Inc. SOS accepted service on 2/7/2023. (jss) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to American Safety Casualty Insurance Company. SOS accepted service on 2/7/2023. (jss) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to National American Insurance Company. SOS accepted service on 2/7/2023. (jss) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION re #1 Complaint. (mail Gollogly, Dudek and Scott) (cnd) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Greenwich Insurance Company. Filing Fee $402.00 PAID. Receipt #AWVNDC-3632754. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Harrison Co. Cir. Court Case #20-C-163-1, #3 Exhibit 2 - First Amended Complaint in 20-C-163-1) [Kleeh](cnd) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less