This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/03/2023 at 18:30:26 (UTC).

Greenwich Insurance Company v. Empire Oil & Gas, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/23/2023 Greenwich Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Empire Oil Gas, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas S Kleeh and Michael John Aloi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00009

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas S Kleeh

Referral Judge

Michael John Aloi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Greenwich Insurance Company

Defendants

P. D. Farr

Empire Oil & Gas, Inc.

Scott A. Windom

William A. Farr

Pete

John C. Farr

Lee Ann Farr

Barbara Wright Sigley

Amy R. Zannino

National American Insurance Company

American Safety Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lee Murray Hall

Defendant Attorneys

David J. Romano

John F. Hussell, IV

Tiffany R. Durst

 

Court Documents

42 #1

Back of Envelope

#42

(#42) Mail sent to Amy R. Zannino #27 Scheduling Order Returned as Undeliverable (Unclaimed). (Attachments: #1 Back of Envelope) (snc) (Entered: 09/29/2023)

#41

(#41) RETURN RECEIPT for Amy R. Zannino as to #39 Order and #40 Order. Per USPS website, SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/23/2023. (snc) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

40 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#40

(#40) ORDER DENYING MOTIONS ECF NOS. #18 , #19 , #20 FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. Accordingly, in the absence of PHV payments to the Clerk of the Court, and in light of the Court's prior Order and Notice ECF No. #28 , it is hereby ORDERED that the pending motions for pro hac vice admissions ECF Nos. #18 , #19 , #20 are DENIED. Attorneys Taylor B. Scott; Joseph Dudek and Ezra S. Gollogly terminated. (Per Chambers -NF). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 8/17/2023. (Copy to pro se defendant by cm/rrr) (snc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2023: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (snc). (Entered: 08/17/2023)

39 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#39

(#39) ORDER FINDING THAT PLAINTIFF HAS SHOWN CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO SERVE COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT SIGLEY, AND DIRECTING THAT MATTER PROCEED IN DUE COURSE. It is thus ORDERED that the litigation herein otherwise shall proceed in the normal due course, as established by prior Order(s) herein and applicable governing rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 8/17/2023. (Copy to pro se defendant by cm/rrr) (snc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2023: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (snc). (Entered: 08/17/2023)

27 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#27

(#42) Mail sent to Amy R. Zannino #27 Scheduling Order Returned as Undeliverable (Unclaimed). (Attachments: #1 Back of Envelope) (snc) (Entered: 09/29/2023)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Amy R. Zannino served on 2/20/2023. (Hall, Lee) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Empire Oil & Gas, Inc. SOS accepted service on 2/7/2023. (jss) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to American Safety Casualty Insurance Company. SOS accepted service on 2/7/2023. (jss) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to National American Insurance Company. SOS accepted service on 2/7/2023. (jss) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

#3

(#3) VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION re #1 Complaint. (mail Gollogly, Dudek and Scott) (cnd) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

1 #3

Exhibit 2 - First Amended Complaint in 20-C-163-1

1 #2

Exhibit 1 - Harrison Co. Cir. Court Case #20-C-163-1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#42) Mail sent to Amy R. Zannino #27 Scheduling Order Returned as Undeliverable (Unclaimed). (Attachments: #1 Back of Envelope) (snc) (Entered: 09/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#41) RETURN RECEIPT for Amy R. Zannino as to #39 Order and #40 Order. Per USPS website, SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/23/2023. (snc) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#40) ORDER DENYING MOTIONS ECF NOS. #18 , #19 , #20 FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. Accordingly, in the absence of PHV payments to the Clerk of the Court, and in light of the Court's prior Order and Notice ECF No. #28 , it is hereby ORDERED that the pending motions for pro hac vice admissions ECF Nos. #18 , #19 , #20 are DENIED. Attorneys Taylor B. Scott; Joseph Dudek and Ezra S. Gollogly terminated. (Per Chambers -NF). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 8/17/2023. (Copy to pro se defendant by cm/rrr) (snc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2023: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (snc). (Entered: 08/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#39) ORDER FINDING THAT PLAINTIFF HAS SHOWN CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO SERVE COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT SIGLEY, AND DIRECTING THAT MATTER PROCEED IN DUE COURSE. It is thus ORDERED that the litigation herein otherwise shall proceed in the normal due course, as established by prior Order(s) herein and applicable governing rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 8/17/2023. (Copy to pro se defendant by cm/rrr) (snc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2023: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (snc). (Entered: 08/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#38) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Greenwich Insurance Company as to #29 Order to Show Cause, . (Hall, Lee) (Entered: 08/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#37) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Barbara Wright Sigley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hussell, John) (Entered: 08/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#36) Mail sent to Amy R. Zannino #28 Order. Returned as Unclaimed. (Attachments: #1 Returned Mail - Back of Envelope) (snc) (Entered: 08/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#35) Mail sent to Amy R. Zannino #30 Order to Answer, #29 Order to Show Cause, Returned as Unclaimed. (Attachments: #1 Returned Mail - Back of Envelope) (snc) (Entered: 08/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#34) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Empire Oil & Gas, Inc., John C. Farr, Lee Ann Farr, P. D. Farr, William A. Farr, Scott A. Windom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6/8/21 Letter, #2 Exhibit 8/3/21 Email, #3 Exhibit 8/13/21 Letter, #4 Exhibit 8/25/21 Email, #5 Exhibit 10/14/21 Email, #6 Exhibit 11/8/22 Letter, #7 Exhibit 12/7/22 Letter)(Romano, David) (Entered: 08/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#33) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Barbara Wright Sigley served on 7/20/2023. (Hall, Lee) (Entered: 07/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
03/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Greenwich Insurance Company. (Hall, Lee) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany R. Durst on behalf of American Safety Casualty Insurance Company, National American Insurance Company (Durst, Tiffany) (Entered: 03/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Greenwich Insurance Company. (Hall, Lee) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Scott A. Windom served on 2/20/2023. (Hall, Lee) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Amy R. Zannino served on 2/20/2023. (Hall, Lee) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Empire Oil & Gas, Inc. SOS accepted service on 2/7/2023. (jss) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to American Safety Casualty Insurance Company. SOS accepted service on 2/7/2023. (jss) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to National American Insurance Company. SOS accepted service on 2/7/2023. (jss) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION re #1 Complaint. (mail Gollogly, Dudek and Scott) (cnd) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Greenwich Insurance Company. Filing Fee $402.00 PAID. Receipt #AWVNDC-3632754. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Harrison Co. Cir. Court Case #20-C-163-1, #3 Exhibit 2 - First Amended Complaint in 20-C-163-1) [Kleeh](cnd) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less