This case was last updated from PACER on 12/10/2019 at 07:50:03 (UTC).

GREENSTEIN v. CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 GREENSTEIN filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony J Trenga and John F. Anderson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02919

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anthony J Trenga

Referral Judge

John F. Anderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lara Greenstein

Defendants

Capital One, National Association

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.

Capital One Financial Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Linda Phyllis Nussbaum

Attorney at Nussbaum Law Group P. C.

1211 Avenue Of The Americas, Floor 40

New York, NY 10036

Defendant Attorney

John C. Toro

Attorney at King & Spalding (GA-NA)

1180 Peachtree St Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309-3521

 

Court Documents

#15

(#14) Pretrial Order #4. Continuing Initial Status and Rule 16(b) Conferences. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 12/9/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#14

(#13) Pretrial Order #3 - Appointing Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, ) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#38

(#12) Pretrial Order #2 - Appointing Defendants' Lead Counsel. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 11/12/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, c/m 11/12/2019) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#13

(#11) Initial Order. Pretrial Order #1 Setting Initial Conference and General Matters. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 11/1/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, ) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

10 #1

*Restricted*

#10

(#10) Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-cv-02307. Original file and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#9

(#9) TRANSFER ORDER dated 10/2/2019 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Anthony Trenga for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2915) (ztnr) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.] (Entered: 10/08/2019)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

(#8) MOTION to Stay , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A., CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION, CAPITAL ONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Toro, John) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.] (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE by LARA GREENSTEIN. CAPITAL ONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION waiver sent on 8/20/2019, answer due 10/19/2019. (Nussbaum, Linda) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.] (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE by LARA GREENSTEIN. CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION waiver sent on 8/20/2019, answer due 10/19/2019. (Nussbaum, Linda) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.] (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE by LARA GREENSTEIN. CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. waiver sent on 8/20/2019, answer due 10/19/2019. (Nussbaum, Linda) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.] (Entered: 08/21/2019)

4 #3

Certificate of Service

4 #2

Exhibit

4 #1

Memorandum in Support

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Motion of District Of Columbia Plaintiffs for Transfer to and Consolidation or Coordination of Related Actions in the District of the District Of Columbia, In re: Capital One Consumer Data Security Breach Litigation, MDL No. 2915. by LARA GREENSTEIN (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate of Service)(Nussbaum, Linda) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.] (Entered: 08/08/2019)

3 #1

Notice and Consent

#3

(#3) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A., CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION, CAPITAL ONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.] (Entered: 08/02/2019)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Pretrial Order #4. Continuing Initial Status and Rule 16(b) Conferences. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 12/9/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Pretrial Order #3 - Appointing Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, ) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Pretrial Order #2 - Appointing Defendants' Lead Counsel. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 11/12/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, c/m 11/12/2019) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Initial Order. Pretrial Order #1 Setting Initial Conference and General Matters. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 11/1/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, ) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-cv-02307. Original file and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) TRANSFER ORDER dated 10/2/2019 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Anthony Trenga for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2915) (ztnr) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.] (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • Case Stayed. (znbn) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.] (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Defendants' #8 Motion to Stay is GRANTED, and the case is STAYED until the JPML rules on consolidation and transfer. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 08/29/2019. (lcjeb2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.] (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Stay , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A., CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION, CAPITAL ONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Toro, John) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.] (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE by LARA GREENSTEIN. CAPITAL ONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION waiver sent on 8/20/2019, answer due 10/19/2019. (Nussbaum, Linda) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.] (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE by LARA GREENSTEIN. CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION waiver sent on 8/20/2019, answer due 10/19/2019. (Nussbaum, Linda) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.] (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE by LARA GREENSTEIN. CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. waiver sent on 8/20/2019, answer due 10/19/2019. (Nussbaum, Linda) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.] (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Motion of District Of Columbia Plaintiffs for Transfer to and Consolidation or Coordination of Related Actions in the District of the District Of Columbia, In re: Capital One Consumer Data Security Breach Litigation, MDL No. 2915. by LARA GREENSTEIN (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate of Service)(Nussbaum, Linda) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.] (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A., CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION, CAPITAL ONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.] (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zeg) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.] (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by LARA GREENSTEIN. Case related to Case No. 19-cv-2265. (zeg) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.] (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A., CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION, CAPITAL ONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6294377) filed by LARA GREENSTEIN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Nussbaum, Linda) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/2/2019) (zeg). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.] (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.