This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/31/2021 at 10:20:48 (UTC).

Greensleeves Publishing LTD. v. Brown et al

Case Summary

On 07/02/2021 Greensleeves Publishing LTD filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Brown. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew L. Carter, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-05751

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew L. Carter, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Greensleeves Publishing Limited

Greensleeves Publishing LTD.

Defendants

Christopher Maurice Brown

Chris Brown TV

SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT, a Delaware partnership

Sony Music Entertainment

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel Joel Aaron

Attorney at Daniel J. Aaron, P.C.

125 Park Avenue, 25Th Fl

New York, NY 10017

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan Zachary King

Attorney at Cowan, Liebowitz, & Latman, PC

114 West 47Th Street

New York, NY 10036

Dasha Chestukhin

Attorney at Cowan, Liebowitz & Latman, P.C.

114 W 47Th Street, Ste 21St Floor

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

#15

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Zachary King on behalf of Sony Music Entertainment..(King, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint or Otherwise Move addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Dasha Chestukhin dated August 24, 2021., #1 Complaint. The application is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Sony Music Entertainment answer due 9/27/2021. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 8/25/2021) (rj) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint or Otherwise Move addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Dasha Chestukhin dated August 24, 2021. Document filed by Sony Music Entertainment..(Chestukhin, Dasha) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Aaron, Daniel) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(pc) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Christopher Maurice Brown..(pc) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chris Brown TV..(pc) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sony Music Entertainment..(pc) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Daniel Joel Aaron to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Civil cover sheet was not signed. (pc) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Daniel Joel Aaron. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Queens;. (pc) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Daniel Joel Aaron. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Christopher Maurice Brown, SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT, a Delaware partnership, Greensleeves Publishing Limited. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; alias party name was omitted;. (pc) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sony Music Entertainment, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Greensleeves Publishing Limited..(Aaron, Daniel) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chris Brown TV, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Greensleeves Publishing Limited..(Aaron, Daniel) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Christopher Maurice Brown, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Greensleeves Publishing Limited..(Aaron, Daniel) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Aaron, Daniel) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Greensleeves Publishing Limited..(Aaron, Daniel) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Aaron, Daniel) Modified on 7/6/2021 (pc). (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Christopher Maurice Brown, Chris Brown TV, SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT, a Delaware partnership. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24752768)Document filed by Greensleeves Publishing Limited..(Aaron, Daniel) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Greensleeves Publishing Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where Sony Music Entertainment Italy S.p.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan Zachary King