Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/09/2021 at 11:39:45 (UTC).

GREENE v. TEMPLE UNIVERSITY et al

Case Summary

On 12/11/2020 GREENE filed an Other lawsuit against TEMPLE UNIVERSITY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN M. YOUNGE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-06315

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN M. YOUNGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAUREN GREENE

Defendants

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

TEMPLE UNIVERSITY

PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER THAT PLFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (ECF NO. 6) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE GREENE WITH AN APPROPRIATE NON-PRISONER APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, BEARING THE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER OF THIS CASE, ETC. IF GREENE SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE, SHE MUST WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, EITHER PAY $402 TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR FILE A SIGNED MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS THAT CONTAINS ALL OF THE INFORMATION REQUESTED ON THE FORM, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 1/7/21.1/7/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE PLFF AND IFP FORM NOT MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

#5

(#5) E-Mail Letter dated 1/4/21, filed by PRO SE PLFF LAUREN GREENE, re: How to obtain aid of federal attorney. (kw, ) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#4

(#4) Letter dated 1/4/21 by LAUREN GREENE (JL ) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND A COPY OF THE UNSIGNED COMPLAINT TO GREENE. IF GREENE SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE SHE SHALL SIGN THE COPY OF THE COMPLAINT AND RETURN IT WITHIN 30 DAYS. IF GREENE SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE, SHE MUST ALSO WITHIN 30 DAYS EITHER PAY $402 TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE GREENE WITH AN APPROPRIATE NON-PRISONER APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 1/4/21. 1/4/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO PRO SE WITH COPY OF COMPLAINT AND IFP FORMS.(amas, ) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#7

(#7) E-Mail Letter dated 1/1/21, filed by PRO SE PLFF LAUREN GREENE. (kw, ) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

#2

(#2) PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, ) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit LETTER

1 #2

Exhibit MEMO

1 #1

Designation Form

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, TEMPLE UNIVERSITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, filed by LAUREN GREENE. (NO FEE PAID; NO IFP FILED) (Attachments: #1 Designation Form, #2 Exhibit MEMO, #3 Exhibit LETTER)(bw, ) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketE-mailed Doc. No. 8 with IFP Application to Pro Se Plaintiff. (er, ) Modified on 1/11/2021 (er, ). (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER THAT PLFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (ECF NO. 6) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE GREENE WITH AN APPROPRIATE NON-PRISONER APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, BEARING THE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER OF THIS CASE, ETC. IF GREENE SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE, SHE MUST WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, EITHER PAY $402 TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR FILE A SIGNED MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS THAT CONTAINS ALL OF THE INFORMATION REQUESTED ON THE FORM, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 1/7/21.1/7/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE PLFF AND IFP FORM NOT MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, FILED BY PRO SE PLFF LAUREN GREENE. "NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED" (Attachments: #1 Memo Styled E-Mail)(kw, ) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) E-Mail Letter dated 1/4/21, filed by PRO SE PLFF LAUREN GREENE, re: How to obtain aid of federal attorney. (kw, ) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Letter dated 1/4/21 by LAUREN GREENE (JL ) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND A COPY OF THE UNSIGNED COMPLAINT TO GREENE. IF GREENE SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE SHE SHALL SIGN THE COPY OF THE COMPLAINT AND RETURN IT WITHIN 30 DAYS. IF GREENE SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE, SHE MUST ALSO WITHIN 30 DAYS EITHER PAY $402 TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE GREENE WITH AN APPROPRIATE NON-PRISONER APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 1/4/21. 1/4/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO PRO SE WITH COPY OF COMPLAINT AND IFP FORMS.(amas, ) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) E-Mail Letter dated 1/1/21, filed by PRO SE PLFF LAUREN GREENE. (kw, ) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, ) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by LAUREN GREENE. (bw, ) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, TEMPLE UNIVERSITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, filed by LAUREN GREENE. (NO FEE PAID; NO IFP FILED) (Attachments: #1 Designation Form, #2 Exhibit MEMO, #3 Exhibit LETTER)(bw, ) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION is a litigant

Latest cases where TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL-EPISCOPAL CAMPUS is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant