This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 08:27:47 (UTC).

Greene v. Stephan et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Greene filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Stephan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shiva V Hodges and Mary Geiger Lewis. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03391

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Shiva V Hodges

Presiding Judge

Mary Geiger Lewis

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Latorey Greene

Mccormick, SC 29899

Latorey J. Greene

Mccormick, SC 29899

Defendants

Capt. Mack

Cheron M. Hess

Warden McKie

Capt. Brightheart

Ms. Ardis

L.T. Belton

S.G.T. Palmer

K. Rivers

S.G.T. Fox

Michael McCall

L.T. Freng

Ms. Miller

Ms. Green

McDuffie

Mrs. Collins

S.G.T. Williams

B. Lewis

Ann Hallman

30 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 1/2/2020. (lbak) Modified on 1/7/2020 to edit text. (lbak) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#15

(#15) JUDGMENT dismissing the action without prejudice. (lbak) (Main Document 15 replaced on 1/22/2020 with corrected scan of document.) (lbak) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

2 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Latorey Greene. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope) (lbak) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER denying #2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 12/6/2019. (lbak) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#14

(#14) ORDER adopting the #11 Report and Recommendation, dismissing Greene's #1 complaint without prejudice and without issuance or service of process. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 1/22/2020. (lbak) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

1 #1

Supporting Documents

1 #2

Envelope

#7

(#7) PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 12/27/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 12/6/2019. (lbak) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Latorey Greene. Response to Motion due by 12/18/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (lbak) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#11

(#11) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending this case be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. If Plaintiff notifies the court within the time set for filing objections to this Report and Recommendation that he wishes to continue with this case and complies with the court's prior order, the Clerk is directed to vacate this Report and Recommendation and return the file to the undersigned for further handling. If, however, no objections are filed, the Clerk shall forward this Report and Recommendation to the district judge for disposition. Objections to R&R due by 1/16/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 1/2/2020. (lbak) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #14 Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation and #15 Judgment placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Latorey Greene, 292916, M.C.I., 386 Redemption Way, McCormick, SC 29899. (lbak) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) JUDGMENT dismissing the action without prejudice. (lbak) (Main Document 15 replaced on 1/22/2020 with corrected scan of document.) (lbak) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER adopting the #11 Report and Recommendation, dismissing Greene's #1 complaint without prejudice and without issuance or service of process. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 1/22/2020. (lbak) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #10 Order - 1983 - No Service and #11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Latorey Greene, 292916, M.C.I., 386 Redemption Way, McCormick, SC 29899. (lbak) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending this case be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. If Plaintiff notifies the court within the time set for filing objections to this Report and Recommendation that he wishes to continue with this case and complies with the court's prior order, the Clerk is directed to vacate this Report and Recommendation and return the file to the undersigned for further handling. If, however, no objections are filed, the Clerk shall forward this Report and Recommendation to the district judge for disposition. Objections to R&R due by 1/16/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 1/2/2020. (lbak) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 1/2/2020. (lbak) Modified on 1/7/2020 to edit text. (lbak) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #6 Order, #7 Proper Form Order, IFP Application, one Summons and one Form USM-285 placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Latorey Greene, 292916, M.C.I., 386 Redemption Way, McCormick, SC 29899. (lbak) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 12/27/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 12/6/2019. (lbak) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER denying #2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 12/6/2019. (lbak) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Latorey Greene. Response to Motion due by 12/18/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (lbak) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Latorey Greene. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope) (lbak) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.