This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/03/2019 at 07:03:58 (UTC).

Greene v. Massachusetts General Hospital System et al

Case Summary

On 07/05/2019 Greene filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Massachusetts General Hospital System. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Stearns. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-11470

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Stearns

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lauren Greene

Washington, DC 20016

Defendants

Governor Charles Baker

State of Massachusetts Board Health

Mental Health Legal Advisors Commitee

Doctor Zaina Chemali

Salem Northshore Medical

Sean McGuigan

Jessica Ranford

Massachusetts General Hospital System

Judge William Fitzpatrick

Havard McLean Hospital

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

RESTRICTED

#4

4 #1

IFP application form

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Copy re #5 Order, #6 Order Dismissing Case mailed to Lauren Greene on 8/16/2019. (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE. (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. For the failure to comply with the July 8, 2019 Order, this action is hereby dismissed without prejudice.(PSSA, 4) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If plaintiff wishes to proceed with this action, within 21 days of this Memorandum and Order, plaintiff either shall (i) pay the $400.00 filing and administrative fees; or (ii) file a renewed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. (Attachments: #1 IFP application form) (PSSA, 4) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lauren Greene.(Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lauren Greene.(Castilla, Francis) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/5/2019) (Castilla, Francis). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/5/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Governor Charlie Baker is a litigant

Latest cases where THE MASSACHUSETTS GENERAL HOSPITAL is a litigant