This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/23/2022 at 08:59:05 (UTC).

Greene v. ARS Acquisition Holdings LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 Greene filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against ARS Acquisition Holdings LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Louise Wood Flanagan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:22-CV-00096

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Louise Wood Flanagan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Debra Greene

Defendants

ARS Acquisition Holdings LLC

The ARS Health and Welfare Benefit Plan

The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

J. Michael Malone

Attorney at Hendren, Redwine & Malone, PLLC

4600 Marriott Dr., Suite 150

Raleigh, NC 27612

Defendant Attorneys

Benjamin Paul Fryer

Attorney at FordHarrison LLP

6000 Fairview Road, Suite 1415

Charlotte, NC 28210

Vanessa N. Garrido

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

8529 Six Forks Road

 

Court Documents

13 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#13

(#13) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, filed by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Garrido, Vanessa) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#12

(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by ARS Acquisition Holdings LLC, The ARS Health and Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Fryer, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order Granting Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer o

#8

Motions Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaintt. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice of Appearance filed by Benjamin Paul Fryer on behalf of ARS Acquisition Holdings LLC, The ARS Health and Welfare Benefit Plan. (Fryer, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#6

(#6) Notice of Appearance filed by Vanessa N. Garrido on behalf of The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Garrido, Vanessa) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#5

Motions Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaintt. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to ARS Acquisition Holdings LLC, The ARS Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#3

(#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by Debra Greene (Malone, J.) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#2

(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by J. Michael Malone on behalf of Debra Greene. (Malone, J.) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

TEXT ORDER granting the Motion for Extension of Time #12 filed by Defendants ARS Acquisition Holdings LLC and the ARS Health and Welfare Benefit Plan. For good cause shown, it is ordered that these defendants have up to and including August 24, 2022, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/11/2022. (Hockaday, A.) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER granting the Consent Motion for Extension of Time filed by Defendant The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company #13 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that this defendant has up to and including September 6, 2022, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/22/2022. (Hockaday, A.) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion No Longer Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan: regarding #13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel regarding: #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. In future filings, counsel should indicate the division in accordance with Local Civil Rule 10.1(b) and 40.1(b) and (c). (Collins, S.) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, filed by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Garrido, Vanessa) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER granting the Motion for Extension of Time #12 filed by Defendants ARS Acquisition Holdings LLC and the ARS Health and Welfare Benefit Plan. For good cause shown, it is ordered that these defendants have up to and including August 24, 2022, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/11/2022. (Hockaday, A.) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by ARS Acquisition Holdings LLC, The ARS Health and Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Fryer, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel regarding: #10 Financial Disclosure Statement, #11 Financial Disclosure Statement. Counsel's signature line does not comply with SectionIV.D.1 of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No need to refile at this time, however counsel should review this policy to make sure all future pleadings meet this requirement. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaintt. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, filed by ARS Acquisition Holdings LLC, The ARS Health and Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond) (Fryer, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Appearance filed by Benjamin Paul Fryer on behalf of ARS Acquisition Holdings LLC, The ARS Health and Welfare Benefit Plan. (Fryer, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Appearance filed by Vanessa N. Garrido on behalf of The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Garrido, Vanessa) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, filed by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Garrido, Vanessa) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketCase Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to ARS Acquisition Holdings LLC, The ARS Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by Debra Greene (Malone, J.) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by J. Michael Malone on behalf of Debra Greene. (Malone, J.) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ARS Acquisition Holdings LLC, The ARS Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6611113.), filed by Debra Greene. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons) (Malone, J.) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARS ACQUISITION HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Lincoln National Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vanessa Nicole Garrido

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin Paul Fryer