This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2021 at 07:54:39 (UTC).

Greene et al v. 4520 Corp Inc et al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 Greene filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against 4520 Corp Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard E. Myers, II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00074

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard E. Myers, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Janet Hales Greene

Defendants

Viking Pump, Inc.

Covil Corporation

Grinnell LLC

Air & Liquid Systems Corporation

Fluor Constructors International

Crane Co.

4520 Corp Inc

Daniel International Corporation

Flowserve US Inc.

Goulds Pumps Incorporated

Ametek, Inc.

General Electric Company

Howden North America Inc.

The William Powell Company

Fluor Enterprises, Inc.

Hercules LLC

Armstrong International, Inc.

Fluor Daniel Services Corporation

Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, a wholly-owned subsidiary of Metlife Inc.

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William M. Graham

Attorney at Wallace & Graham, PA

525 N. Main St.

Salisbury, NC 28144

Jordan Blumenfeld-James

Attorney at Dean Omar Branham Shirley LLP

302 N. Market Street, Suite 300

Dallas, TX 75202

Defendant Attorneys

Ashley Kamphaus Brathwaite

Attorney at Ellis & Winters LLP

4131 Parklake Avenue,, Suite 400

Raleigh, NC 27612

Curtis J. Shipley

Attorney at Ellis & Winters LLP

Post Office Box 2752, Zip Code 27402

300 N. Greene Street, SU 800

Leslie C. Packer

Attorney at Ellis & Winters LLP

4131 Parklake Avenue,, Suite 400

Raleigh, NC 27612

Scottie Forbes Lee

Attorney at Ellis & Winters LLP

Post Office Box 2752, Zip Code 27402

300 N. Greene Street, SU 800

Tracy E. Tomlin

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP

301 South College Street, 23Rd Floor

Charlotte, NC 28202-4007

William Michael Starr

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP

301 South College Street, 23Rd Floor

Charlotte, NC 28202-4007

Christopher Barton Major

Attorney at Haynsworth Sinkler Boyd

P.O. Box 2048

Greenville, SC 29602-2048

Moffatt G. McDonald

Attorney at Haynsworth Sinkler Boyd, P.A.

Post Office Box 2048, One North Main, 2Nd Floor

Greenville, SC 29602

Scott E. Frick

Attorney at Haynsworth Sinkler Boyd, P.A.

Post Office Box 2048, One North Main, 2Nd Floor

Greenville, SC 29602

William David Conner

Attorney at Haynsworth Sinkler Boyd, P.A.

Post Office Box 2048, One North Main, 2Nd Floor

Greenville, SC 29602

Emily Mather

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

4350 Lassiter At North Hills Avenue, Suite 300

Raleigh, NC 27609

Marla Tun Reschly

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

300 South Tryon Street, Suite 1000

Charlotte, NC 28202

Jason Larry Walters

Attorney at Davis & Hamrick, LLP

P. O. Drawer 20039

Winston-Salem, NC 27120-0039

Eric T. Hawkins

Attorney at Hawkins Parnell & Young LLP

303 Peachtree Street Ne, Suite 4000

Atlanta, GA 30308-3243

Douglas Andrew Rubel

Attorney at Hawkins Parnell & Young LLP

P. O. Box 1285

Cary, NC 27512-1285

Timothy Peck

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

230 N. Elm Street, Suite 1200

Greensboro, NC 27401

Other Attorneys

Kelly Brooks Jones

Attorney at Nexsen Pruet, PLLC

4141 Parklake Ave., Suite 200

Raleigh, NC 27612

Peter A. Santos

Attorney at Nexsen Pruet, PLLC

227 West Trade Street, Suite 1500

Charlotte, NC 28202

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#98

#97

#96

#95

#94

#93

60 #2

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Refund of Duplicative Filing Fees

60 #1

Exhibit Redacted Credit Card Statement

#60

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Proposed Summons Proposed Summons all Defendants

1 #3

Disclosure

1 #2

Disclosure

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

94 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) ORDER granting #60 Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. Signed by Chief US District Judge Richard E. Myers II on 7/7/2021. (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel regarding: #97 Financial Disclosure Statement. Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" the document prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. The deputy clerk will flatten the document. No need to refile at this time. (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#97) Financial Disclosure Statement by Viking Pump, Inc. (Drayton, Amy) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#96) ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/1/2021. (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Viking Pump, Inc. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#95) Defendant Viking Pump, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Viking Pump, Inc.. (Drayton, Amy) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#94) Notice of Appearance filed by Amy C. Drayton on behalf of Viking Pump, Inc.. (Drayton, Amy) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#93) Notice of Appearance filed by Timothy Peck on behalf of Armstrong International, Inc.. (Peck, Timothy) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #91 Answer to Complaint. All counsel appearing on behalf of a party should file a notice of appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). Counsel is directed to file a notice of appearance in accordance with this Rule. (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) Financial Disclosure Statement by Armstrong International, Inc. (Peck, Timothy) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
96 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. *NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summonses and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4.* (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCase transferred in from Western Division Division on 05/14/2021; former case number: 5:21-cv-222-M. (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Redesignating Division to the Eastern Division. The Honorable Richard E. Myers II, Chief United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents shall reflect the new case number of 4:21-CV-74-M. No further filing shall be made in 5:21-CV-222-M. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/14/2021. (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Financial Disclosure Statement by Elsie Collier Hales (Graham, William) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by Janet Hales Greene (Graham, William) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by William M. Graham on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Graham, William) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketNotice to Counsel - This case should have been filed in the Eastern division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketNotice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding [1-2] Financial Disclosure Statement, [1-3] Financial Disclosure Statement. The Financial Disclosure statement is a stand alone document therefore Counsel is directed to refile the Financial Disclosure Statements using the event "Other Documents - Financial Disclosure Statement. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6042513.), filed by Elsie Collier Hales, Janet Hales Greene. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Disclosure, #3 Disclosure, #4 Proposed Summons all Defendants) (Graham, William) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Hercules LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where COVIL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION is a litigant