This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/02/2022 at 08:02:18 (UTC).

Greenberg Traurig, LLP v. Verwest

Case Summary

On 02/01/2022 Greenberg Traurig, LLP filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Verwest. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kristen L. Mix. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00286

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristen L. Mix

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Defendants

Tijs Verwest

Tiesto

Interested Party

USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Michael Lyons

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP

1601 19Th Street, Suite 1000

Denver, CO 80202

David E. Jimenez-Ekman

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

353 North Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60654-4704

Frederick J. Baumann

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP

1601 19Th Street, Suite 1000

Denver, CO 80202

Michael Patrick McNamara

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

515 South Flower Street, Suite 3300

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant Attorneys

Maureen Reidy Witt

Attorney at Holland & Hart LLP-Denver

P. O. Box 8749, 555 17Th Street

Denver, CO 80201-8749

Michael James Carrigan

Attorney at Holland & Hart LLP-Denver

P. O. Box 8749, 555 17Th Street

Denver, CO 80201-8749

Interested Party Attorney

Shiva H. Logarajah

Attorney at Department of Justice

300 Quarropas Street

White Plains, NY 10601

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on April 1, 2022. This matter is before the Court on Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #19 (the "Motion"). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion #19 is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the operative complaint is extended to April 19, 2022.(csarr, ) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#19

(#19) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Tijs Verwest. (Carrigan, Michael) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#18

(#18) MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Interested Party USA. (Logarajah, Shiva) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

#17

RESTRICTED

#16

RESTRICTED

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Shiva H. Logarajah on behalf of USAAttorney Shiva H. Logarajah added to party USA(pty:ip) (Logarajah, Shiva) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Maureen Reidy Witt on behalf of Tijs VerwestAttorney Maureen Reidy Witt added to party Tijs Verwest(pty:dft) (Witt, Maureen) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

13 #2

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

13 #13

Main Document

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David E. Jimenez-Ekman on behalf of Greenberg Traurig, LLPAttorney David E. Jimenez-Ekman added to party Greenberg Traurig, LLP(pty:pla) (Jimenez-Ekman, David) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Patrick McNamara on behalf of Greenberg Traurig, LLPAttorney Michael Patrick McNamara added to party Greenberg Traurig, LLP(pty:pla) (McNamara, Michael) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#7

(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (trvo, ) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#6

(#6) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 2/3/2022. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-00286-KLM. (trvo, ) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Frederick J. Baumann on behalf of Greenberg Traurig, LLPAttorney Frederick J. Baumann added to party Greenberg Traurig, LLP(pty:pla) (Baumann, Frederick) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Tijs Verwest by Plaintiff Greenberg Traurig, LLP. (Lyons, James) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#3

(#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (jcharl, ) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on April 1, 2022. This matter is before the Court on Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #19 (the "Motion"). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion #19 is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the operative complaint is extended to April 19, 2022.(csarr, ) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Tijs Verwest. (Carrigan, Michael) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Interested Party USA. (Logarajah, Shiva) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Interested Party USA.. (Logarajah, Shiva) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Interested Party USA.. (Logarajah, Shiva) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Shiva H. Logarajah on behalf of USAAttorney Shiva H. Logarajah added to party USA(pty:ip) (Logarajah, Shiva) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Maureen Reidy Witt on behalf of Tijs VerwestAttorney Maureen Reidy Witt added to party Tijs Verwest(pty:dft) (Witt, Maureen) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on February 4, 2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 4/14/2022 Scheduling Conference set for 4/21/2022 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Instructions for Preparation of Scheduling Order, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only)) (csarr, ) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#3] is April 7, 2022. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/4/2022. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, ) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Greenberg Traurig, LLP. Tijs Verwest waiver sent on 2/4/2022, answer due 4/5/2022. (Lyons, James) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (trvo, ) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David E. Jimenez-Ekman on behalf of Greenberg Traurig, LLPAttorney David E. Jimenez-Ekman added to party Greenberg Traurig, LLP(pty:pla) (Jimenez-Ekman, David) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Patrick McNamara on behalf of Greenberg Traurig, LLPAttorney Michael Patrick McNamara added to party Greenberg Traurig, LLP(pty:pla) (McNamara, Michael) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (trvo, ) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 2/3/2022. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-00286-KLM. (trvo, ) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Frederick J. Baumann on behalf of Greenberg Traurig, LLPAttorney Frederick J. Baumann added to party Greenberg Traurig, LLP(pty:pla) (Baumann, Frederick) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Tijs Verwest by Plaintiff Greenberg Traurig, LLP. (Lyons, James) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (jcharl, ) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (jcharl, ) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Tijs Verwest (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8295070)Attorney James Michael Lyons added to party Greenberg Traurig, LLP(pty:pla), filed by Greenberg Traurig, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lyons, James) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP is a litigant