This case was last updated from PACER on 09/06/2021 at 09:36:11 (UTC).

Green v. Walmart

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 Green filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Walmart. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Billy Roy Wilson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00611

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Billy Roy Wilson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zena Green

North Little Rock, AR 72114

Defendant

Walmart

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MOTION for Order filed by Zena Green. (kth) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #1 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for service upon Defendant Walmart, Inc; directing the U.S. Marshal to serve the summons, along with a copy of the Complaint and this Order, on the Defendant; and denying without prejudice #3 motion for counsel. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/9/2021. (jbh) (Docket text modified on 7/12/2021 to correct the description of the document filed) (jak) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER provisionally granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, pursuant to General Order No. 29. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 7/8/2021. (jbh) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Zena Green. (jbh) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT UNDER TITLE VII OF THE CIVIL RIGHTS ACT OF 1964 against Walmart, filed by Zena Green. (jbh) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Zena Green. (jbh) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying #6 Plaintiff's Motion for Order because it is nonsensical. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 07/22/21. (dmm) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Order filed by Zena Green. (kth) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #5 Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the #3 Motion for Counsel was denied without prejudice as marked on the Order. (jak) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Walmart and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (jbh) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #1 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for service upon Defendant Walmart, Inc; directing the U.S. Marshal to serve the summons, along with a copy of the Complaint and this Order, on the Defendant; and denying without prejudice #3 motion for counsel. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/9/2021. (jbh) (Docket text modified on 7/12/2021 to correct the description of the document filed) (jak) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER provisionally granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, pursuant to General Order No. 29. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 7/8/2021. (jbh) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Zena Green. (jbh) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT UNDER TITLE VII OF THE CIVIL RIGHTS ACT OF 1964 against Walmart, filed by Zena Green. (jbh) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Zena Green. (jbh) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant