This case was last updated from PACER on 04/23/2019 at 07:35:16 (UTC).

Green v. SS Transportation Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2019 Green filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SS Transportation Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Elizabeth Preston Deavers and Edmund A. Sargus. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00613

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Elizabeth Preston Deavers

Presiding Judge

Edmund A. Sargus

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ashley A Green

Defendants

Kaushal Express, Inc.

12612 South Race Street

Olathe, KS 66061

Gurchetan Singh

Olathe, KS 66061

Abdikarim Abdirahman

St. Louis, MO 63116

Anu Kaushal

Olathe, KS 66061

SS Transportation Inc.

12612 South Race Street

Olathe, KS 66061

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew R. Young

Attorney at Young & McCarthy LLP

31387 Lorain Road

Cleveland, OH 44070

Don J Young, III

Attorney at Young & McCarthy LLP

15 W Winter St

Delaware, OH 43015

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Richard Henry

Attorney at Crabbe Brown & James - 2

500 S Front Street, Suite 1200

Columbus, OH 43215

Robert Charles Buchbinder

Attorney at Crabbe Brown & James - 2

500 S Front Street, Suite 1200

Columbus, OH 43215

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants Abdikarim Abdirahman, Anu Kaushal, Kaushal Express, Inc., SS Transportation Inc., Gurchetan Singh. (Buchbinder, Robert) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/9/2019 10:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. Please Note: The Rule 26(f) Report for the Eastern Division has changed. Please ensure that you are using the correct form. (sln) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

#14

(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Kaushal Express, Inc.. (Buchbinder, Robert) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

#13

(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant SS Transportation Inc.. (Buchbinder, Robert) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

1 #6

Summons Form To Anu Kaushal

1 #5

Summons Form To Gurchetan Singh

1 #4

Summons Form To Abdikarim Abdirahman

1 #3

Summons Form To Kaushal Express, Inc.

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6806439), filed by Ashley A Green. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form To SS Transportation Inc., #3 Summons Form To Kaushal Express, Inc., #4 Summons Form To Abdikarim Abdirahman, #5 Summons Form To Gurchetan Singh, #6 Summons Form To Anu Kaushal) (Young, Andrew) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

#12

(#12) Defendants SS Transportation, Inc, Abdikarim Abdirahman, Gurchetan Singh, Kaushal Express, Inc. and Anu Kaushal's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by All Defendants. (Buchbinder, Robert) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons Form To SS Transportation Inc.

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Charles Buchbinder for Defendants Abdikarim Abdirahman, Anu Kaushal, Kaushal Express, Inc., SS Transportation Inc., Gurchetan Singh (Buchbinder, Robert) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to All Defendants. Served on 2/25/2019; Answer due 4/26/2019. (Buchbinder, Robert) Added information concerning service and answer due dates on 3/27/2019 (er). (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Ashley A Green Subpoena Duces Tecum to Madison County Prosecutor's Office (Young, Andrew) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE by Plaintiff Ashley A Green re #6 Certificate of Service Proof of Service of Subpoena (Young, Andrew) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Ashley A Green Subpoena Duces Tecum to Ohio State Highway Patrol (West Jefferson Post) (Young, Andrew) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE by Plaintiff Ashley A Green re #5 Certificate of Service Proof of Service of Subpoena (Young, Andrew) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants Abdikarim Abdirahman, Anu Kaushal, Kaushal Express, Inc., SS Transportation Inc., Gurchetan Singh. (Buchbinder, Robert) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/9/2019 10:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. Please Note: The Rule 26(f) Report for the Eastern Division has changed. Please ensure that you are using the correct form. (sln) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Kaushal Express, Inc.. (Buchbinder, Robert) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant SS Transportation Inc.. (Buchbinder, Robert) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Defendants SS Transportation, Inc, Abdikarim Abdirahman, Gurchetan Singh, Kaushal Express, Inc. and Anu Kaushal's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by All Defendants. (Buchbinder, Robert) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Charles Buchbinder for Defendants Abdikarim Abdirahman, Anu Kaushal, Kaushal Express, Inc., SS Transportation Inc., Gurchetan Singh (Buchbinder, Robert) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to All Defendants. Served on 2/25/2019; Answer due 4/26/2019. (Buchbinder, Robert) Added information concerning service and answer due dates on 3/27/2019 (er). (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE by Plaintiff Ashley A Green re #6 Certificate of Service Proof of Service of Subpoena (Young, Andrew) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE by Plaintiff Ashley A Green re #5 Certificate of Service Proof of Service of Subpoena (Young, Andrew) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE by Plaintiff Ashley A Green re #4 Certificate of Service Proof of Service of Subpoena (Young, Andrew) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Ashley A Green Subpoena Duces Tecum to Madison County Prosecutor's Office (Young, Andrew) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Ashley A Green Subpoena Duces Tecum to Ohio State Highway Patrol (West Jefferson Post) (Young, Andrew) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Ashley A Green Subpoena Duces Tecum to Ohio State Highway Patrol (Young, Andrew) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Ellen M. McCarthy. (daf) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Abdikarim Abdirahman, Anu Kaushal, Kaushal Express, Inc., SS Transportation Inc., and Gurchetan Singh. (daf) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6806439), filed by Ashley A Green. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form To SS Transportation Inc., #3 Summons Form To Kaushal Express, Inc., #4 Summons Form To Abdikarim Abdirahman, #5 Summons Form To Gurchetan Singh, #6 Summons Form To Anu Kaushal) (Young, Andrew) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.