This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/21/2022 at 08:35:02 (UTC).

Green v. Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 Green filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen B. Molzen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00042

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen B. Molzen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Krishna Lynn Green

Defendant

Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Feliz MariSol Martone

Attorney at Martone Law Firm, P.A.

111 Lomas Blvd., N.W., Suite 400

Albuqerque, NM 87102

Defendant Attorney

Manuel Lucero

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

Po Box 607

Albuquerque, NM 87103

 

Court Documents

#4

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Krishna Lynn Green. Social Security Administration served on 2/16/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. (Martone, Feliz) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Krishna Lynn Green. Social Security Administration served on 2/9/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. (Martone, Feliz) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Krishna Lynn Green. Social Security Administration served on 2/22/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. (Martone, Feliz) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 5 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Social Security Administration, 3 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Krishna Lynn Green. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Social Security Administration voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Lucero, Manuel)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Lucero on behalf of Social Security Administration (Lucero, Manuel) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dr) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • Docket(#3) CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Krishna Lynn Green voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Martone, Feliz)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen assigned. (jg) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8081542 re #1 Complaint filed by Krishna Lynn Green (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Martone, Feliz) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Krishna Lynn Green. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martone, Feliz) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Social Security Administrative Record is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Manuel Lucero